This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2019 at 06:09:47 (UTC).

George Calhoun, Jr. v. Rushmore Loan Management Servi

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 George Calhoun, Jr filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Rushmore Loan Management Servi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1195

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

GEORGE E. CALHOUN, JR.

Chicago, IL 60608-0000

Defendant / Appellee

RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

George E. Calhoun Jr.

Attorney at COOK COUNTY JAIL

2700 S. California Avenue, P.O. Box 089002

Chicago, IL 60608-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Final Order

#2

(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6981216] [19-1195] (AP) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:37 AM]

3 #2

Mandate

Open Document #2

Mandate

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

3 #1

Final Order

#1

Civil Rights Case

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 03/27/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6993424-2] [6993424] [19-1195] (CM) [Entered: 03/27/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED for failure to pay the required docketing fee pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). The appellant shall remit to the clerk of the district court the $505 appellate fees. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. The appellant has neither paid the $505 appellate fees nor filed a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis in the district court.[3][6993414] [19-1195] (CM) [Entered: 03/27/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6981216] [19-1195] (AP) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant George E. Calhoun Jr. by 02/04/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 02/28/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 02/12/2019. [1] [6981213] [19-1195] (AP) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.