This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/18/2019 at 08:39:44 (UTC).

Gensetix, Inc. v. Baylor College of Medicine

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Gensetix, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Baylor College of Medicine. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1424

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

WILLIAM K. DECKER

DIAKONOS RESEARCH LTD

BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE

Plaintiff / Appellee

THE BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM

Plaintiff / Appellant

GENSETIX, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Murray Jules Fogler Esq.

Attorney at Fogler Brar Ford O'Neil and Gray LLP

909 Fannin Street

Houston, TX 77010

Gordon Arnold

Attorney at Arnold, Knobloch & Saunders, L.L.P.

4900 Woodway Drive

Houston, TX 77056

Michael Hawes

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

910 Louisiana, One Shell Plaza

Houston, TX 77002

Paul R. Morico

Attorney at Baker Botts LLC

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Peter E. Mims

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

1001 Fannin Street

Houston, TX 77002-6760

Janice Ta

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

2801 Via Fortuna

Austin, TX 78746

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Imron T. Aly

Attorney at Schiff Hardin

233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Sarah Elizabeth Spires

Attorney at Skiermont Derby LLP

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher Michael Hodge

Attorney at Skiermont Derby LLP

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75201

Paul Skiermont

Attorney at Skiermont Derby LLP

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher Michael Bruno Esq.

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

901 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Mieke K. Malmberg

Attorney at Skiermont Derby LLP

800 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to extend time to file brief Docket No. [ # 28 ], ERROR: The motion filed by Gensetix, Inc. did not include the proper caption. CORRECTION: For future filings, please use the official caption which is located on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [591879] [TAM] [Entered: 03/11/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 28 ] filed by Appellant Gensetix, Inc. Appellant's opening brief is due 04/17/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [591873] [TAM] [Entered: 03/11/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION of Appellant Gensetix, Inc. to extend the time to 04/17/2019 to file the unopposed extension of time of 30 days from March 18, 2019 to and including April 17, 2019. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/08/2019 by email. [591573] [19-1424] [Sarah Spires] [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Docketing Statement for the Appellee William K. Decker. Service: 02/01/2019 by email. [582818] [19-1424] [Murray Fogler] [Entered: 02/01/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Docketing Statement for the Appellee The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System. Service: 02/01/2019 by email. [582807] [19-1424] [Peter Mims] [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellee The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System. Service: 02/01/2019 by email. [582804] [19-1424] [Peter Mims] [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System, Certificate of Interest [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/08/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[582775] [TAM] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • (#23) Official caption revised to add appellate designation for The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [582774] [TAM] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Entry of appearance for Murray J. Fogler as principal counsel for Appellee William K. Decker. Service: 02/01/2019 by email. [582664] [19-1424] [Murray Fogler] [Entered: 02/01/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee William K. Decker. Service: 02/01/2019 by email. [582662] [19-1424] [Murray Fogler] [Entered: 02/01/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Diakonos Research Ltd. Service: 01/30/2019 by email. [582229] [19-1424] [Gordon Arnold] [Entered: 01/30/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Diakonos Research Ltd. Service: 01/30/2019 by email. [582228] [19-1424] [Gordon Arnold] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Gordon T. Arnold as principal counsel for Appellee Diakonos Research Ltd. Service: 01/30/2019 by email. [582221] [19-1424] [Gordon Arnold] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interest for the Not party The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System. Service: 01/30/2019 by email. [582220] [19-1424] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 24 ] [Peter Mims] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Janice Le Ta as of counsel for Not party The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System. Service: 01/30/2019 by email. [582218] [19-1424] [Janice Ta] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Peter E. Mims as principal counsel for Not party The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System. Service: 01/30/2019 by email. [582217] [19-1424] [Peter Mims] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Paul R. Morico as of counsel for Appellee Baylor College of Medicine. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579365] [19-1424] [Paul Morico] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Michael Hawes as principal counsel for Appellee Baylor College of Medicine. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579356] [19-1424] [Michael Hawes] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • (#2) Official caption revised to correct listed appellants. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [578977] [CAB] [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/11/2019. [578959] Entry of Appearance due 01/31/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/31/2019. Docketing Statement due 01/31/2019. Appellant's brief is due 03/18/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Michael Bruno Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah E. Spires