This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/17/2019 at 06:06:29 (UTC).

Genentech, Inc. v. Immunex Rhode Island Corp.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Genentech, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Immunex Rhode Island Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2155

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF HOPE

Defendant / Appellees

AMGEN INC.

IMMUNEX RHODE ISLAND CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

GENENTECH, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amir A. Naini

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3206

Sarah Cork

Attorney at Proskauer Rose

2029 Century Park East, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Siegmund Y. Gutman

Attorney at Proskauer Rose

2029 Century Park East, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven M. Bauer

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

One International Place

Boston, MA 02110

John E. Roberts

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

One International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Jeffrey A. Lamken

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Michael Gregory Pattillo Jr.

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Wendy A. Whiteford

Attorney at Amgen Inc.

One Amgen Center Drive, Mailstop 28-2-C

Thousand Oaks, CA 91320

J. Drew Diamond

Attorney at Amgen Inc.

One Amgen Center Drive, Mailstop 28-2-C

Thousand Oaks, CA 91320

Melanie K. Sharp Esq.

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

Rodney Square, 1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Lucas M. Walker

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Nancy Gettel

Attorney at Amgen Inc.

One Amgen Center Drive

Thousand Oaks, CA 91320

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paul B. Gaffney

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

David I. Berl Esq.

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Kathryn Schleckser Kayali

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Thomas S. Fletcher

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

#32

#30

#28

#27

#26

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER filed denying [ # 3 ] motion for an injunction pending appeal filed by Genentech, Inc. ECF No. 32 [ # 32 ] is granted. The reply is accepted for filing. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [628890] [LMS] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Genentech, Inc.. Service: 08/05/2019 by email. [626041] [19-2155] [Kathryn Kayali] [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Amgen Inc. and Immunex Rhode Island Corporation. Service: 08/02/2019 by email. [625833] [19-2155] [Siegmund Gutman] [Entered: 08/02/2019 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION of Appellant Genentech, Inc. to waive confidentiality requirements [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 08/01/2019 by email. [625475] [19-2155] [Paul Gaffney] [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Sealed or confidential document received [Genentech's Non-Confidential Reply ISO Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal] (corresponding to Doc No. [ # 30 ]) for Appellant Genentech, Inc.. Service: 08/01/2019 by email, US mail. [625474] [19-2155] [Paul Gaffney] [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY of Appellant Genentech, Inc. to response [ # 28 ]. Service: 08/01/2019 by email. [625473] [19-2155] [Paul Gaffney] [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Sealed or confidential document received [CONFIDENTIAL OPPOSITION TO CONFIDENTIAL EMERGENCY MOTION FOR AN INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. APP. P. 8(A)] (corresponding to Doc No. [ # 28 ]) for Appellees Amgen Inc. and Immunex Rhode Island Corporation. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624338] [19-2155] [Siegmund Gutman] [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE of Appellees Amgen Inc. and Immunex Rhode Island Corporation to the motion for temporary injunction pending appeal [ # 3 ] filed by Appellant Genentech, Inc.. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624337] [19-2155] [Siegmund Gutman] [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Entry of appearance for J Drew Diamond as of counsel for Appellees Amgen Inc. and Immunex Rhode Island Corporation. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624330] [19-2155] [Amir Naini] [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Amgen Inc. and Immunex Rhode Island Corporation. Service: 07/29/2019 by email. [624290] [19-2155] [Siegmund Gutman] [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Siegmund Y. Gutman as principal counsel for Appellees Amgen Inc. and Immunex Rhode Island Corporation. Service: 07/22/2019 by email. [622458] [19-2155] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 13 ] [Siegmund Gutman] [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Genentech, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/29/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [622399] [TAM] [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for David I. Berl as of counsel for Appellant Genentech, Inc.. Service: 07/19/2019 by email. [622359] [19-2155] [David Berl] [Entered: 07/19/2019 07:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Thomas S. Fletcher as of counsel for Appellant Genentech, Inc.. Service: 07/19/2019 by email. [622357] [19-2155] [Thomas Fletcher] [Entered: 07/19/2019 07:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Genentech, Inc.. Service: 07/19/2019 by email. [622355] [19-2155] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 9 ] [Kathryn Kayali] [Entered: 07/19/2019 07:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Kathryn S. Kayali as of counsel for Appellant Genentech, Inc.. Service: 07/19/2019 by email. [622344] [19-2155] [Kathryn Kayali] [Entered: 07/19/2019 06:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Sealed or confidential document received [Genentech's Confidential Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal] (corresponding to Doc No. [ # 3 ]) for Appellant Genentech, Inc.. Service: 07/19/2019 by email, US mail. [622339] [19-2155] [Paul Gaffney] [Entered: 07/19/2019 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION of Appellant Genentech, Inc. for temporary injunction [Consent: opposed]. Service: 07/19/2019 by email. [622337] [19-2155] [Paul Gaffney] [Entered: 07/19/2019 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Paul B. Gaffney as principal counsel for Genentech, Inc. Service: 07/19/2019 by email. [622335] [19-2155]--[Edited 07/22/2019 by MJL to add party filer] [Paul Gaffney] [Entered: 07/19/2019 05:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/19/2019. [622215] Entry of Appearance due 08/02/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/02/2019. Docketing Statement due 08/02/2019. Appellant's brief is due 09/17/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amgen Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Genentech, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul B. Gaffney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas S. Fletcher