This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2021 at 06:19:37 (UTC).

Genentech, Inc. v. Eli Lilly and Company

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Genentech, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Eli Lilly and Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1874

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

ELI LILLY AND COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellee

GENENTECH, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Katherine A. Helm Ph.D.

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Laura Pollard Masurovsky Esq.

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

901 New York Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Lawrence Scott Burwell

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner LLP

1875 Explorer Street

Reston, VA 20190

Blaine Hackman

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Sharon K. Gagliardi

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Cira Centre, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Allen Jacobs

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Eric Martin Acker

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive

San Diego, CA 92130

Seth W. Lloyd

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Matthew Ian Kreeger Esq.

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Deanne Maynard

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION of Appellant Eli Lilly and Company to extend the time to 08/20/2021 to file brief. Service: 06/07/2021 by email. [778913] [21-1874] [Blaine Hackman] [Entered: 06/07/2021 05:34 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 05/06/2021 by email. [773414] [21-1874] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/06/2021 01:25 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 05/06/2021 by email. [773413] [21-1874] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/06/2021 01:23 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Deanne E. Maynard; Michael Allen Jacobs; Matthew I. Kreeger; Eric Martin Acker; Seth W. Lloyd as counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 05/06/2021 by email. [773411] [21-1874] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/06/2021 01:22 PM]

#6

(#6) Corrected Entry of appearance for Katherine A. Helm; Blaine M. Hackman; Sharon K. Gagliardi; Laura P. Masurovsky; L. Scott Burwell as counsel for Appellant Eli Lilly and Company. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772966] [21-1874] [Blaine Hackman] [Entered: 05/04/2021 10:05 PM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Eli Lilly and Company. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772957] [21-1874] [Katherine Helm] [Entered: 05/04/2021 06:13 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Eli Lilly and Company. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772956] [21-1874] [Katherine Helm] [Entered: 05/04/2021 06:11 PM]

#3

(#3) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Eli Lilly and Company indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772955] [21-1874] [Katherine Helm] [Entered: 05/04/2021 06:10 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Katherine A. Helm as counsel for Appellant Eli Lilly and Company. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772952] [21-1874] [Katherine Helm] [Entered: 05/04/2021 06:05 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 10 ] filed by Appellant Eli Lilly and Company. The opening brief is due 08/20/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [778958] [EKD] [Entered: 06/08/2021 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION of Appellant Eli Lilly and Company to extend the time to 08/20/2021 to file brief. Service: 06/07/2021 by email. [778913] [21-1874] [Blaine Hackman] [Entered: 06/07/2021 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 05/06/2021 by email. [773414] [21-1874] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/06/2021 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 05/06/2021 by email. [773413] [21-1874] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/06/2021 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Deanne E. Maynard; Michael Allen Jacobs; Matthew I. Kreeger; Eric Martin Acker; Seth W. Lloyd as counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 05/06/2021 by email. [773411] [21-1874] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/06/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corrected Entry of appearance for Katherine A. Helm; Blaine M. Hackman; Sharon K. Gagliardi; Laura P. Masurovsky; L. Scott Burwell as counsel for Appellant Eli Lilly and Company. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772966] [21-1874] [Blaine Hackman] [Entered: 05/04/2021 10:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Eli Lilly and Company. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772957] [21-1874] [Katherine Helm] [Entered: 05/04/2021 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Eli Lilly and Company. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772956] [21-1874] [Katherine Helm] [Entered: 05/04/2021 06:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Eli Lilly and Company indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772955] [21-1874] [Katherine Helm] [Entered: 05/04/2021 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Katherine A. Helm as counsel for Appellant Eli Lilly and Company. Service: 05/04/2021 by email. [772952] [21-1874] [Katherine Helm] [Entered: 05/04/2021 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/20/2021. [770596] Entry of Appearance is due on 05/06/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/06/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 05/06/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 06/21/2021. [EKD] [Entered: 04/22/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELI LILLY AND COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Genentech, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Ian Kreeger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Martin Acker