This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/08/2022 at 06:14:31 (UTC).

Gene Palmer, II v. Tienney Milnor, et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Gene Palmer, II filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tienney Milnor. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-35214

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

GENE ALFRED PALMER II

Ellensburg, WA 98926

Defendant / Appellees

TIENNEY MILNOR, her husband and their marital community

MELANIE TRATNIK, her husband and their marital community

STATE OF WASHINGTON OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & INDUSTRIES

LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA LOCAL 292

DISTRICT COUNCIL OF LABORERS WASHINGTON AND NORTHERN IDAHO

SNOHOMISH COUNTY

SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

SNOHOMISH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

DANIEL J. CHRISTOFFERSON, his wife and their marital community

FRANCIS LEAMAN, his wife and their marital community

JAMIE CLARK, her husband and their marital community

NOEL MCMURTRAY, his wife and their marital community

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gene Alfred Palmer II

110 W. 6Th Avenue, #392

Ellensburg, WA 98926

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gauri Shrotriya Locker Esquire

800 5Th Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Meghan Callagee O'Brien

Attorney at AGWA - OFFICE OF THE WASHINGTON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SEATTLE)

800 5Th Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Noel McMurtray

P.O. Box 3324

Bellevue, WA 98009

Katherine Heather Bosch

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

Kelsey L. O'Neal

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

#2

Main Document

2 #3

Additional Document

#4

(#4) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: issues on appeal. Motion filed by Appellant Gene Alfred Palmer, II. [12404798] (DJV) [Entered: 03/25/2022 09:07 AM]

7 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Additional Document

7 #3

Additional Document

#9

(#9) Filed Appellant Gene Alfred Palmer, II motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/07/2022. [12418893] (DJV) [Entered: 04/12/2022 02:27 PM]

#10

(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellees Department of Labor & Industries, Francis Leaman, Tienney Milnor, State of Washington Office of the Attorney General and Melanie Tratnik response joining motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 04/14/2022. [12421381] [22-35214] (O'Brien, Meghan) [Entered: 04/14/2022 11:56 AM]

#11

(#11) Filed letter dated 04/07/2022 re: addendum to DE 9. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12432698] (DJV) [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:21 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellee Snohomish County response joining motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 04/28/2022. [12433208] [22-35214] (Bosch, Katherine) [Entered: 04/28/2022 09:29 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellee Snohomish County response joining motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 04/28/2022. [12433208] [22-35214] (Bosch, Katherine) [Entered: 04/28/2022 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed letter dated 04/07/2022 re: addendum to DE 9. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12432698] (DJV) [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellees Department of Labor & Industries, Francis Leaman, Tienney Milnor, State of Washington Office of the Attorney General and Melanie Tratnik response joining motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 04/14/2022. [12421381] [22-35214] (O'Brien, Meghan) [Entered: 04/14/2022 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed Appellant Gene Alfred Palmer, II motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/07/2022. [12418893] (DJV) [Entered: 04/12/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 7 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees Laborers International Union of North America Local 292 and District Council of Laborers Washington and Northern Idaho Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 04/07/2022. [12416687] [22-35214] (McMurtray, Noel) [Entered: 04/09/2022 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees District Council of Laborers Washington and Northern Idaho and Laborers International Union of North America Local 292 Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 04/07/2022. [12414517] [22-35214] (McMurtray, Noel) [Entered: 04/07/2022 05:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • Docket(#6) Attorney Gauri Shrotriya Locker substituted by Attorney Meghan Callagee O'Brien in 22-35214. [12410170] (HH) [Entered: 03/31/2022 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Meghan Callagee O'Brien (Washington State Attorney General Office 800 Fifth Ave, Suite 2000, Seattle, WA 98104-3188) for Appellees Department of Labor & Industries, Francis Leaman, Tienney Milnor, State of Washington Office of the Attorney General and Melanie Tratnik. Substitution for Attorney Gauri Shrotriya Locker, Esquire for Appellees Department of Labor & Industries, Francis Leaman, Tienney Milnor, State of Washington Office of the Attorney General and Melanie Tratnik. Date of service: 03/31/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12410162] [22-35214] (O'Brien, Meghan) [Entered: 03/31/2022 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: issues on appeal. Motion filed by Appellant Gene Alfred Palmer, II. [12404798] (DJV) [Entered: 03/25/2022 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#3) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 03/15/2022. [12395208] (RT) [Entered: 03/15/2022 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12390582] (CKP) [Entered: 03/09/2022 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Gene Alfred Palmer II opening brief due 05/06/2022. Appellees Tienney Milnor, et al. answering brief due 06/06/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12390192] (HH) [Entered: 03/09/2022 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laborers' International Union of North America is a litigant

Latest cases where Department Of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases where SNOHOMISH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Heather Bosch