This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/22/2021 at 06:04:04 (UTC).

Gene Palmer, II v. Tienney Milnor, et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Gene Palmer, II filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tienney Milnor. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35695

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

GENE ALFRED PALMER II

Ellensburg, WA 98926

Defendant / Appellees

TIENNEY MILNOR, her husband and their marital community

MELANIE TRATNIK, her husband and their marital community

STATE OF WASHINGTON OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & INDUSTRIES

LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA LOCAL 292

DISTRICT COUNCIL OF LABORERS WASHINGTON AND NORTHERN IDAHO

SNOHOMISH COUNTY

SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

SNOHOMISH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

DANIEL J. CHRISTOFFERSON, his wife and their marital community

FRANCIS LEAMAN, his wife and their marital community

JAMIE CLARK, her husband and their marital community

NOEL MCMURTRAY, his wife and their marital community

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gene Alfred Palmer II

110 W. 6Th Avenue#392

Ellensburg, WA 98926

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gauri Shrotriya Locker Esquire

Attorney at AGWA - OFFICE OF THE WASHINGTON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SEATTLE)

800 5Th Avenuesuite 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Noel McMurtray

P.O. Box 3324

Bellevue, WA 98009

Katherine Heather Bosch

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenuem/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

Kelsey L. O'Neal

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenuem/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MANDATE ISSUED. (MDH, PJW and KKL) [12254621] (RL) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Gene Alfred Palmer, II motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: Case closed. [12233646] (QDL) [Entered: 09/20/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Gene Alfred Palmer, II motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: Case closed. [12233644] (QDL) [Entered: 09/20/2021 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed order (MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, PAUL J. WATFORD and KENNETH K. LEE) : A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the district court has not issued any orders that are final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with rule). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12230785] (RT) [Entered: 09/16/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Gene Alfred Palmer II opening brief due 10/25/2021. Appellees Daniel J. Christofferson, Jamie Clark, Department of Labor & Industries, District Council of Laborers Washington and Northern Idaho, Laborers International Union of North America Local 292, Francis Leaman, Noel McMurtray, Tienney Milnor, Snohomish County, Snohomish County Prosecutor's Office, Snohomish County Sheriff's Department, State of Washington Office of the Attorney General and Melanie Tratnik answering brief due 11/26/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12208196] (RT) [Entered: 08/23/2021 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laborers' International Union of North America is a litigant

Latest cases where Department Of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases where SNOHOMISH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Heather Bosch