Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 06:12:47 (UTC).

Gene Palmer, II v. Tienney Milnor, et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Gene Palmer, II filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tienney Milnor. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35273

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

NOEL MCMURTRAY, his wife and their marital community

SNOHOMISH COUNTY

DEPARTMENT OF LABOR & INDUSTRIES

MELANIE TRATNIK, her husband and their marital community

SNOHOMISH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

DANIEL J. CHRISTOFFERSON, his wife and their marital community

JAMIE CLARK, her husband and their marital community

TIENNEY MILNOR, her husband and their marital community

DISTRICT COUNCIL OF LABORERS WASHINGTON AND NORTHERN IDAHO

LABORERS INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA LOCAL 292

FRANCIS LEAMAN, his wife and their marital community

STATE OF WASHINGTON OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

GENE ALFRED PALMER II

Ellensburg, WA 98926

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gene Alfred Palmer II

101 S. Pearl Street, #103

Ellensburg, WA 98926

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kelsey L. O'Neal

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

Katherine Heather Bosch

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

Gauri Shrotriya Locker Esquire

Attorney at AGWA - OFFICE OF THE WASHINGTON ATTORNEY GENERAL (SEATTLE)

800 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Noel McMurtray

P.O. Box 3324

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MANDATE ISSUED. (RAP, MSB and DJF) [12133638] (QDL) [Entered: 06/04/2021 09:12 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed order (RICHARD A. PAEZ, MARSHA S. BERZON and DANIELLE J. HUNSAKER) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the orders challenged in the appeal are not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (en banc) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12112244] (JMR) [Entered: 05/13/2021 02:31 PM]

#5

(#5) Received notice of change of address dated 04/01/2021 from Gene Alfred Palmer, II. New address: 110 W. 6th Avenue, #392, Ellensburg, WA 98926. [12112065] --[Edited: Updated Address. 05/13/2021 by TYL] (QDL) [Entered: 05/13/2021 01:16 PM]

#4

(#4) Mail returned on 04/29/2021 addressed to Gene Alfred Palmer, II, re: 04/12/2021 Case Opening Information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: Return to sender; 10-day 4/16. Resending to: Case files; no forwarding address found [12098057] (JBS) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:17 AM]

#3

(#3) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed on 4/12/2021. [12073290] (QDL) [Entered: 04/13/2021 05:24 PM]

1 #4

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MANDATE ISSUED. (RAP, MSB and DJF) [12133638] (QDL) [Entered: 06/04/2021 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed order (RICHARD A. PAEZ, MARSHA S. BERZON and DANIELLE J. HUNSAKER) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the orders challenged in the appeal are not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (en banc) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12112244] (JMR) [Entered: 05/13/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received notice of change of address dated 04/01/2021 from Gene Alfred Palmer, II. New address: 110 W. 6th Avenue, #392, Ellensburg, WA 98926. [12112065] --[Edited: Updated Address. 05/13/2021 by TYL] (QDL) [Entered: 05/13/2021 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mail returned on 04/29/2021 addressed to Gene Alfred Palmer, II, re: 04/12/2021 Case Opening Information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: Return to sender; 10-day 4/16. Resending to: Case files; no forwarding address found [12098057] (JBS) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed on 4/12/2021. [12073290] (QDL) [Entered: 04/13/2021 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 04/12/2021. [12070910] (BY) [Entered: 04/12/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Gene Alfred Palmer II opening brief due 06/08/2021. Appellees Tienney Milnor, et al. answering brief due 07/08/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12070331] (JPD) [Entered: 04/12/2021 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laborers' International Union of North America is a litigant

Latest cases where Department Of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases where SNOHOMISH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Heather Bosch