This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/16/2022 at 06:05:07 (UTC).

Gemini Insurance Company v. Zurich American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 Gemini Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-13495

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant / Appellee

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Alyssa Mara Reiter

Attorney at Wicker Smith O'Hara McCoy & Ford, PA

515 E Las Olas Blvd Ste 1400

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301-4250

 

Court Documents

#16

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. Appellants brief due on 12/28/2022 as to Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. Appendix due on 01/04/2023 as to Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:40 PM]

#11

(#11) Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/28/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:36 PM]

#14

(#14) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Zurich American Insurance Company, Court Reporter: Rebekah Lockwood, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 01/26/2022 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 05/18/2022 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 08/24/2022 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 08/31/2022. [Entered: 11/17/2022 03:29 PM]

#10

(#10) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Alyssa Mara Reiter for Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-13495] (ECF: Alyssa Reiter) [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:11 PM]

#9

(#9) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Alyssa Mara Reiter for Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company. [22-13495] (ECF: Alyssa Reiter) [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:07 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Alyssa Mara Reiter for Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13495] (ECF: Alyssa Reiter) [Entered: 11/16/2022 03:40 PM]

13 #3

Judgement

13 #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

13 #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

#7

(#7) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 11/01/2022 03:37 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alyssa M. Reiter for Zurich American Insurance Company [22-13495] (ECF: Alyssa Reiter) [Entered: 10/26/2022 04:20 PM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13495] (ECF: Philip Savrin) [Entered: 10/26/2022 11:27 AM]

#4

(#4) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-13495] (ECF: Philip Savrin) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:15 PM]

#3

(#3) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. [22-13495] (ECF: Philip Savrin) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:12 PM]

#2

(#2) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Philip Wade Savrin for Gemini Insurance Company. [22-13495] (ECF: Philip Savrin) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:10 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Judgment

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [22-13495, 22-13826] [Entered: 12/08/2022 12:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. Appellants brief due on 12/28/2022 as to Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. Appendix due on 01/04/2023 as to Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/28/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Zurich American Insurance Company, Court Reporter: Rebekah Lockwood, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 01/26/2022 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 05/18/2022 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 08/24/2022 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 08/31/2022. [Entered: 11/17/2022 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Alyssa Mara Reiter for Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-13495] (ECF: Alyssa Reiter) [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Alyssa Mara Reiter for Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company. [22-13495] (ECF: Alyssa Reiter) [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Alyssa Mara Reiter for Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13495] (ECF: Alyssa Reiter) [Entered: 11/16/2022 03:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company on 11/09/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 11/17/2022 03:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 11/01/2022 03:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alyssa M. Reiter for Zurich American Insurance Company [22-13495] (ECF: Alyssa Reiter) [Entered: 10/26/2022 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13495] (ECF: Philip Savrin) [Entered: 10/26/2022 11:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-13495] (ECF: Philip Savrin) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Philip Wade Savrin for Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. [22-13495] (ECF: Philip Savrin) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Philip Wade Savrin for Gemini Insurance Company. [22-13495] (ECF: Philip Savrin) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Gemini Insurance Company on 10/14/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/03/2022 as to Appellant Gemini Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/17/2022 as to Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company [Entered: 10/20/2022 01:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant