This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/27/2022 at 18:46:21 (UTC).

Geiss v. The Weinstein Company Holdings

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Geiss filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against The Weinstein Company Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1007

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melissa Thompson

Nannette Klatt, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Sara Ann Thomas, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, AKA Sarah Ann Masse

Jane Doe

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

Richard Koenigsberg

Tim Sarnoff

Paul Tudor Jones

James Dolan

Nancy Ashbrooke

Miramax Film NY, LLC

Disney Enterprises, Inc.

The Walt Disney Company

John Does 1-50, inclusive

Irwin Reiter

Robert Weinstein

Harvey Weinstein

Rick Schwartz

Plaintiff / Appellants

Larissa Gomes

Melissa Sagemiller, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Nannette May, FKA Nannette Klatt

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Allison Noel Angel Esq.

1 Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10165

John Christian Scalzo Esq.

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Laura R. Washington Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Evan R. Chesler

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

Worldwide Plaza, 825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

J. Wesley Earnhardt Esq.

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

Worldwide Plaza, 825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Daniel S. Ruzumna

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

John Jacob Rosenberg Esq.

1330 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Barry A. Bohrer Esq.

Attorney at Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.

Chrysler Center, 666 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Imran H. Ansari Esq.

Attorney at Aidala Bertuna & Kamins PC

546 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10036

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lynn A. Ellenberger Esq.

Attorney at Fegan Scott LLC

500 Grant Street

Pittburgh, PA 15219

Shelby Smith Esq.

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 2Nd Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Other Attorneys

John Clune Esq.

Attorney at Hutchinson, Black & Cook, LLC

921 Walnut Street

Boulder, CO 80302

Robert Marc Barta Esq.

Attorney at Barta Tate

1801 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brad S. Karp Esq.

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Lawrence Steven Spiegel Esq.

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Silvia L. Serpe Esq.

Attorney at Serpe LLC

16 Madison Square West

New York, NY 10010

Gerald Leonard Maatman Jr.

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

620 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Douglas Eric Grover Esq.

26 Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Kathleen A. Jorrie

Attorney at Luce, Forward, Hamilton & Scripps LLP

601 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Israel David

1 New York Plaza

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#116

(#116) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[3185308] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 10/01/2021 03:30 PM]

#115

(#115) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 10/01/2021, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3185305] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 10/01/2021 03:29 PM]

#114

(#114) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to dismiss [ # 105 ] filed by Appellant Katherine Kendall, Melissa Sagemiller, Nannette May, Caitlin Dulany and Larissa Gomes, FILED. [3185302][114] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 10/01/2021 03:28 PM]

#110

(#110) JOINDER LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Brock, informing the Court that the Appellant Zoe Brock joins in the motion to dismiss filed by Appellant Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May and Melissa Sagemiller, RECEIVED. Service date 10/01/2021 by CM/ECF.[3185214] [21-1007]--[Edited 10/01/2021 by JB] [Entered: 10/01/2021 02:23 PM]

#105

(#105) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellant Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May and Melissa Sagemiller in 21-1007, 21-1011, FILED. Service date 09/30/2021 by CM/ECF. [3184580] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 09/30/2021 03:15 PM]

#104

(#104) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 Stipulation with Prejudice, [103], on behalf of Appellant Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May and Melissa Sagemiller in 21-1007, FILED.[3184550] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 09/30/2021 03:00 PM]

#102

(#102) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 08/16/2021, to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, ISSUED.[3156880] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:43 PM]

#101

(#101) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to hold appeal in abeyance until their claims are resolved, but no later than 09/30/2021 [ # 96 ] filed by Appellant Katherine Kendall, Melissa Sagemiller, Nannette May, Caitlin Dulany and Larissa Gomes in 21-1007, by JAC, FILED. [3156866][101] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:37 PM]

#96

(#101) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to hold appeal in abeyance until their claims are resolved, but no later than 09/30/2021 [ # 96 ] filed by Appellant Katherine Kendall, Melissa Sagemiller, Nannette May, Caitlin Dulany and Larissa Gomes in 21-1007, by JAC, FILED. [3156866][101] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:37 PM]

#95

No Description Available

#93

No Description Available

#91

No Description Available

#84

No Description Available

#78

No Description Available

#76

#75

#74

#72

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[3185308] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 10/01/2021 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 10/01/2021, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3185305] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 10/01/2021 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to dismiss [ # 105 ] filed by Appellant Katherine Kendall, Melissa Sagemiller, Nannette May, Caitlin Dulany and Larissa Gomes, FILED. [3185302][114] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 10/01/2021 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) JOINDER LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Brock, informing the Court that the Appellant Zoe Brock joins in the motion to dismiss filed by Appellant Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May and Melissa Sagemiller, RECEIVED. Service date 10/01/2021 by CM/ECF.[3185214] [21-1007]--[Edited 10/01/2021 by JB] [Entered: 10/01/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, [ # 105 ], on behalf of Appellant Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May and Melissa Sagemiller in 21-1007, FILED.[3184602] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 09/30/2021 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellant Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May and Melissa Sagemiller in 21-1007, 21-1011, FILED. Service date 09/30/2021 by CM/ECF. [3184580] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 09/30/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 Stipulation with Prejudice, [103], on behalf of Appellant Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May and Melissa Sagemiller in 21-1007, FILED.[3184550] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 09/30/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#103) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 09/30/2021 by CM/ECF.[3184515] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 09/30/2021 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 08/16/2021, to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, ISSUED.[3156880] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to hold appeal in abeyance until their claims are resolved, but no later than 09/30/2021 [ # 96 ] filed by Appellant Katherine Kendall, Melissa Sagemiller, Nannette May, Caitlin Dulany and Larissa Gomes in 21-1007, by JAC, FILED. [3156866][101] [21-1007, 21-1011] [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#14) NOTE: See lead case, 21-1007, containing complete set of docket entries.[3084332] [21-1011] [Entered: 04/22/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3084289] [21-1011] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Caitlin Dulany, Larissa Gomes, Katherine Kendall, Nannette May and Melissa Sagemiller in 21-1011, FILED. [3084277] [21-1011, 21-1007] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#8) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Laura R. Washington, Esq. for Appellee Miramax Film NY, LLC and Tim Sarnoff, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3084266] [21-1007] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#7) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney John Clune, Esq. for Appellant Zoe Brock, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3084265] [21-1007] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#6) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Imran H. Ansari, Esq. for Appellee Harvey Weinstein, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3084263] [21-1007] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3084253] [21-1007] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Brock, district court receipt # ANYSDC-24433554, FILED.[3084249] [21-1007] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/18/2019, RECEIVED.[3084248] [21-1007] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Brock, FILED. [3084243] [21-1007] [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miramax Film Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Disney Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WALT DISNEY COMPANY THE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Steven Spiegel Esq.