This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 06:05:55 (UTC).

Gavin Davis v. Jason Adler, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Gavin Davis filed an Other lawsuit against Jason Adler. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55157

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CAMERON FIFE

JONATHAN NEWTON

JASON M. ADLER

JOHN DOE, Affiliates of Adler, as Individuals or Entities; Members of the Former Chi Chapter of Psi Upsilon, Cornell University, as Individuals

U.S. NAVY COMMANDER, Seal Team 10

CORNELL UNIVERSITY

TIMOTHY P. O'HARA

SAMI RASHID

Plaintiff / Appellant

GAVIN B. DAVIS

San Diego, CA 92101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gavin B. Davis

615 C Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Frederick William Kosmo Jr.

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway, Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Valerie Phan

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway, Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Additional Document

18 #1

Main Document

17 #2

Additional Document

17 #1

Main Document

16 #4

Additional Document

16 #3

Additional Document

16 #2

Additional Document

16 #1

Main Document

14 #2

Additional Document

14 #1

Main Document

13 #2

Additional Document

13 #1

Main Document

12 #3

Additional Document

12 #2

Additional Document

12 #1

Main Document

11 #3

Additional Document

11 #2

Additional Document

11 #1

Main Document

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis Correspondence: Defendant-Appelles are conspiring with a member of organized crime and fugitive from summons.. Date of service: 04/08/2020 [11654888] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 04/08/2020 05:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis Correspondence: CORRESPONDENCE TO THE COURT: NOTICE OF DEFENDANT-APPELLEES VIOLATIONS OF UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (ARTICLES 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 19, 23, 24, 27, 28, 29, 30). Date of service: 03/30/2020 [11644872] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 03/30/2020 04:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Certification of Question to Supreme Court (28 USC sec 1254)]. Date of service: 03/24/2020. [11639943] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#15) Terminated Frederick William Kosmo Jr. for Cornell University in 20-55157 - was entered in error at time appeal was opened. [11636938] (RT) [Entered: 03/20/2020 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Defendant-Appellees to Rectify Legal Representation of Parties as currently Misrepresented on the Dockets and also timely name the Co-Conspirators and Co-Defendants (see eg ABA Rule 3.3)]. Date of service: 03/19/2020. [11634814] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 03/19/2020 06:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis Correspondence: Notice COVID-19 60-day Extension of time to comply with ORDER ECF 7. Date of service: 03/18/2020 [11633413] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 03/18/2020 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis Correspondence: Circle Rule 28.2-6 Statement of Pending Related Cases. Date of service: 03/17/2020 [11631840] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 03/17/2020 06:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis Urgent Motion for injunction pending appeal, Motion for miscellaneous relief [Defendant-Appelles are accused of crime (Conspiracy), 18 USC 2261A, 2511 (directly, or indirectly (18 USC 4)) and Plaintiff-Appellant reasonably requests timely federal intervention.]. Date of service: 03/11/2020. [11625589] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 03/11/2020 02:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Valerie A. Phan for party(s) Appellee Jonathan Newton Appellee Timothy P. O'Hara Appellee Sami Rashid. [11622626] (RL) [Entered: 03/09/2020 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Valerie Phan (Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP, 402 West Broadway, Suite 1600, San Diego, CA 92101) for Appellees Sami Rashid, Timothy P. O'Hara and Jonathan Newton. Date of service: 03/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11622618] [20-55157] (Phan, Valerie) [Entered: 03/09/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis Urgent Motion to remand case. Date of service: 02/29/2020. [11613743] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 02/29/2020 04:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY and RONALD M. GOULD) Appellants emergency motion for injunction pending appeal [ # 4 ] is denied. See Winter v. Natural Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7, 20 (2008). No motions for reconsideration, clarification, or modification of this denial will be entertained on an emergency basis. Appellants motion for an extension of time to pay the docketing and filing fees for this appeal or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted [ # 6 ]. On or before April 15, 2020, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. Appellants motion for reconsideration of the February 18, 2020 order is granted [ # 6 ]. Appellants opening brief is now due May 15, 2020. Appellees answering brief is due June 15, 2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the excerpts of record requirement is waived. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Appellees supplemental excerpts of record are limited to the district court docket sheet, the notice of appeal, the judgment or order appealed from, and any specific portions of the record cited in appellees brief. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.7. [11612911] (CKP) [Entered: 02/28/2020 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis Urgent Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Clarification and Reasonable Extension of Time to pay Docketing Fee]. Date of service: 02/24/2020. [11605746] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 02/24/2020 05:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) Streamlined request [3] by Appellant Gavin B. Davis to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is premature. The current briefing schedule is as follows: Appellant Gavin B. Davis opening brief due 04/15/2020. Appellees Jason M. Adler, Cornell University, Cameron Fife, John Doe, Jonathan Newton, Timothy P. O'Hara, Sami Rashid and U.S. Navy Commander answering brief due 05/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11600059] (JN) [Entered: 02/18/2020 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gavin B. Davis EMERGENCY Motion for injunction pending appeal. Date of service: 02/16/2020. [11598879] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 02/16/2020 05:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Gavin B. Davis. New requested due date is 05/15/2020. [11596722] [20-55157] (Davis, Gavin) [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11596641] (CKP) [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Gavin B. Davis opening brief due 04/15/2020. Appellees Jason M. Adler, Cornell University, Cameron Fife, John Doe, Jonathan Newton, Timothy P. O'Hara, Sami Rashid and U.S. Navy Commander answering brief due 05/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11596453] (RT) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less