This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 06:22:31 (UTC).

Gater Assets Limited v. AO Gazsnabtranzit

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Gater Assets Limited filed an Other lawsuit against AO Gazsnabtranzit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4021

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendants

AO Gazsnabtranzit

Republic of Moldova

Plaintiff / Appellee

Gater Assets Limited

Defendant / Appellant

AO Moldovagaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Dennis H. Hranitzky

Attorney at Dechert LLP

3 Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

May Chiang Esq.

Attorney at Dechert LLP

3 Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Michael H. McGinley Esq.

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Cira Centre, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Robert Kelsey Kry

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Lauren Marguerite Weinstein Esq.

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

#49

#48

#43

#39

#33

#32

#31

#22

#20

#19

#18

#17

15 #4

Exhibit C

15 #3

Exhibit B

15 #2

Exhibit A

15 #1

Motion FILED

#105

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Republic of Moldova in 19-3550 Brief due date as 03/13/2020 FILED.[2753239] [19-3550, 19-3562, 19-3747, 19-4017, 19-4021, 19-4147] [Entered: 01/15/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2749508] [19-4021] [Entered: 01/10/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee AO Moldovagaz Brief due date as 03/13/2020 FILED.[2740691] [19-3550, 19-3562, 19-3747, 19-4017, 19-4021, 19-4147] [Entered: 12/30/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant AO Moldovagaz, informing Court of proposed due date 03/13/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 12/23/2019 by CM/ECF.[2737609] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER, vacating previous order [ # 36 ] dated 12/23/2019. Appellant AO Moldovagaz may file a new scheduling notification proposing a brief filing date that falls within 91 days of the date Form D was filed in Docket No. 19-4021, FILED.[2737042] [19-3550, 19-3562, 19-3747, 19-4017, 19-4021, 19-4147] [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee AO Moldovagaz Brief due date as 02/06/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 02/06/2020, FILED.[2736832] [19-3550, 19-3562, 19-3747, 19-4017, 19-4021, 19-4147] [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY, May Chiang for Gater Assets Limited, in case 19-4021, [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2735344] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/20/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ATTORNEY, Michael H. McGinley for Gater Assets Limited, in case 19-4021, [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2735340] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/20/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Gater Assets Limited, FILED. Service date 12/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735122] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/19/2019 06:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Gater Assets Limited, FILED. Service date 12/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735117] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/19/2019 06:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY, Robert Kry, [ # 13 ], in place of attorney Arkady Bukh, SUBSTITUTED.[2721862] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/05/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant AO Moldovagaz, FILED. Service date 12/04/2019 by CM/ECF. [2721090] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant AO Moldovagaz, informing the Court that Bukh law firm would like to withdraw as counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 12/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2721034] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2720743] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • (#8) NOTE: See lead case, 19-4017, containing complete set of docket entries.[2720740] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • (#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant AO Moldovagaz, district court receipt # ANYSDC-18173409, FILED.[2720707] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISTRICT COURT RENEWAL JUDGMENT, dated 11/01/2019, RECEIVED.[2720706] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2720704] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/30/2018, RECEIVED.[2720703] [19-4021] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant AO Moldovagaz in 19-4021, FILED. [2720695] [19-4021, 19-4017] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gater Assets Limited is a litigant