This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 06:03:17 (UTC).

Gary Wilson v. Warden

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Gary Wilson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-7480

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

WARDEN, USP Lee

Petitioner / Appellant

GARY KOMPTON WILSON

Jonesville, VA 24263-0305

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Gary Kompton Wilson

Attorney at UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY LEE

P. O. Box 305

Jonesville, VA 24263-0305

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Gary Kompton Wilson. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/20/2020 01:50 PM]

#4

(#4) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Wilson. Informal Opening Brief due 10/29/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:41 PM]

3 #2

Form

3 #1

Notice

#2

(#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 10/19/2020. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:37 PM]

#1

(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 7:20-cv-00216-JPJ-PMS. Date notice of appeal filed: 10/05/2020. Case manager: TFischer. Did district court rule on COA? N/A. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:18 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Gary Kompton Wilson. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/20/2020 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 7:20-cv-00216-JPJ-PMS. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/08/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Wilson. Informal Opening Brief due 10/29/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Gary Kompton Wilson - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/04/2020 Originating case number: 7:20-cv-00216-JPJ-PMS. Mailed to: Wilson. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 10/19/2020. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 7:20-cv-00216-JPJ-PMS. Date notice of appeal filed: 10/05/2020. Case manager: TFischer. Did district court rule on COA? N/A. [20-7480] TF [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less