This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2020 at 06:04:44 (UTC).

Gary Rand, et al v. Midland National Life Insuranc, et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Gary Rand filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Midland National Life Insuranc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55020

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

LESLIE B. RAND-LUBY, Individually and As Trustee of the Leslie B. Rand-Luby Living Trust Dated November 10, 1995

GARY RAND, Individually and As Trustee of the Rand 1992 Irrevocable Trust

SUZANNE E. RAND-LEWIS, Individually and As Trustee of the Suzanne E. Rand-Lewis Family Trust Dated August 17, 1993

Defendant / Appellees

DOES, 1 through 100

MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE

MICHAEL L. KELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Timothy D. Rand-Lewis

Attorney at Law Office of Timothy D Rand-Lewis

5990 Sepulveda Blvd.

Sherman Oaks, CA 91411-2523

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Edith Sanchez Shea Esquire

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Karen Tsui

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christie B. Carrino

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn, S.C.

833 East Michigan Street, Suite 1800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Paul F. Heaton

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn, S.C.

833 East Michigan Street, Suite 1800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Marc Kevin Herbert

Attorney at Law Office of Marc Herbert

190 Sierra Court, Suite B-3

Palmdale, CA 93550

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11612488] (BLS) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:46 AM]

#11

(#11) Filed order MEDIATION (JW): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants' opening brief is due April 13, 2020; appellees' answering brief is due May 13, 2020; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [11605339] (AF) [Entered: 02/21/2020 04:22 PM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Further Conference w/ counsel for appellant only, 02/18/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11591954] (BLS) [Entered: 02/10/2020 03:26 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/07/2020, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 02/04/2020). [11581281] (BLS) [Entered: 01/31/2020 02:30 PM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/04/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11580220] (BLS) [Entered: 01/30/2020 06:05 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Gary Rand, Suzanne E. Rand-Lewis and Leslie B. Rand-Luby Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/15/2020. [11564153] [20-55020] (Rand-Lewis, Timothy) [Entered: 01/15/2020 05:32 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11612488] (BLS) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed order MEDIATION (JW): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants' opening brief is due April 13, 2020; appellees' answering brief is due May 13, 2020; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [11605339] (AF) [Entered: 02/21/2020 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Further Conference w/ counsel for appellant only, 02/18/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11591954] (BLS) [Entered: 02/10/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/07/2020, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 02/04/2020). [11581281] (BLS) [Entered: 01/31/2020 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/04/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11580220] (BLS) [Entered: 01/30/2020 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket(#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/15/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11564187]. [20-55020] (AD) [Entered: 01/15/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Gary Rand, Suzanne E. Rand-Lewis and Leslie B. Rand-Luby Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/15/2020. [11564153] [20-55020] (Rand-Lewis, Timothy) [Entered: 01/15/2020 05:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Marc Kevin Herbert for party(s) Appellee Michael L. Kelly, in case 20-55020. [11561542] (RT) [Entered: 01/14/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#4) Terminated attorney Edith Sanchez Shea for Michael L. Kelly in 20-55020, attorney Karen Tsui for Michael L. Kelly in 20-55020 [11561535] (RT) [Entered: 01/14/2020 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Christie B. Carrino, Paul F. Heaton for party(s) Appellee Midland National Life Insurance, in case 20-55020. [11561529] (RT) [Entered: 01/14/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christie B. Carrino (Godfrey & Kahn, S.C. 833 East Michigan Street, Suite 1800, Milwaukee, WI 53202) for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance. Date of service: 01/14/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11561195] [20-55020] (Carrino, Christie) [Entered: 01/14/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Gary Rand, Suzanne E. Rand-Lewis and Leslie B. Rand-Luby Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/15/2020. Appellants Gary Rand, Suzanne E. Rand-Lewis and Leslie B. Rand-Luby opening brief due 03/12/2020. Appellees Does, Michael L. Kelly and Midland National Life Insurance answering brief due 04/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11554560] (RT) [Entered: 01/08/2020 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christie B. Carrino

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul F. Heaton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edith S Shea