This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 06:04:27

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Gary Quigg against Chris Evans, in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.

Case Details

  • Case Number 19-35590
  • Filing Date 07/16/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Civil Right
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Courts Of Appeals
  • Courthouse U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

Party Details

  • Plaintiff / Appellant GARY LEE QUIGG
  • Represented By
    • Gary Lee Quigg
  • Defendant / Appellee CHRIS EVANS
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant / Appellee DAN TAYLOR
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant / Appellee JOHN AND JANE DOES, 1-5
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant / Appellee STATE OF MONTANA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant / Appellee MIKE WEBSTER
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): Appellants motion...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Gary Lee Quigg motion to extend time to...

Fees Apply
2 #4

Additional Document

Fees Apply
2 #3

Additional Document

Fees Apply
2 #1

Main Document

Fees Apply
#2

Additional Document

Fees Apply
1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

Fees Apply
#1

Docketing Letter

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • (#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): Appellants motion for an extension of time [ # 3 ] to respond to this courts July 17, 2019 order is granted. Appellant shall file a response on or before September 30, 2019. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute under Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is stayed pending further order of the court. [11417118] (CKP) [Entered: 08/30/2019 02:33 PM]
  • 08/28/2019
  • (#3) Filed Appellant Gary Lee Quigg motion to extend time to comply with the order dated 07/17/2019. Deficiencies: None. [11413896] (NAC) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:33 PM]
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and has revoked appellants in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If the court dismisses the appeal as frivolous, this appeal may be counted as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11366798] (CKP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:19 PM]
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Gary Lee Quigg opening brief due 09/13/2019.[11365291] (JPD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:48 PM]

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.