This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 at 06:10:30 (UTC).

Gary Luis, et al v. RBC Capital Markets, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 Gary Luis filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against RBC Capital Markets, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2706

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Merri L. Vitse, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Gary A. Mentz

Michael J. Vitse

Gary Luis

Caryl Luis

Defendant / Appellee

RBC Capital Markets, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Eric S. Taubel

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Vernon Jay Vander Weide

Attorney at LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL

Suite 2200, 100 Washington Avenue, S.

Minneapolis, MN 55401-0000

Scott D. Hirsch

Attorney at SCOTT HIRSCH LAW GROUP, PLLC

Suite 207A, 7301 W. Palmetto Park Road

Boca Raton, FL 33433

Gregg Martin Fishbein

Attorney at LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL

Suite 2200, 100 Washington Avenue, S.

Minneapolis, MN 55401-0000

Daniel C. Hedlund

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

David A. Goodwin

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael E. Rowe III

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY

Suite 1500, 50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

James Kevin Langdon II

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY

Suite 1500, 50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Kirsten Schubert

50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse, w/service 10/02/2019 [4837261] [19-2706] (MDS) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:27 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse. w/service 10/02/2019, Length: 9546 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Caryl Luis, Gary Luis, Gary A. Mentz, Merri L. Vitse and Michael J. Vitse due 10/07/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of RBC Capital Markets, LLC due on 11/01/2019. [4837228] [19-2706] (MDS) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:49 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse - w/service 08/27/2019. [4823902] [19-2706] (EST) [Entered: 08/27/2019 03:32 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse - Joint Appendix - w/service 08/27/2019 [4823892] [19-2706] (EST) [Entered: 08/27/2019 03:27 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse. - FOR CAL [4821427] [19-2706] (GMF) [Entered: 08/21/2019 09:48 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Kirsten E. Schubert for Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC w/service 08/14/2019 [4819308] [19-2706] (KS) [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Michael E. Rowe for Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC w/service 08/14/2019 [4818967] [19-2706] (MER) [Entered: 08/14/2019 10:05 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Daniel C. Hedlund for Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse w/service 08/13/2019 [4818827] [19-2706] (DCH) [Entered: 08/13/2019 05:10 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Eric S. Taubel for Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse w/service 08/13/2019 [4818825] [19-2706] (EST) [Entered: 08/13/2019 05:07 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by James K. Langdon for Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC w/service 08/13/2019 [4818806] [19-2706] (JKL) [Entered: 08/13/2019 04:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Vernon J. Vander Weide for Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse w/service 08/13/2019 [4818620] [19-2706] (GMF) [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Gregg M. Fishbein for Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse w/service 08/13/2019 [4818617] [19-2706] (GMF) [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:27 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 09/23/2019. Appendix due 10/02/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Caryl Luis, Gary Luis, Gary A. Mentz, Merri L. Vitse and Michael J. Vitse due 10/02/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4818444] [19-2706] (CYZ) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:13 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 7/11/19, judgment of 7/12/19 [4818441] [19-2706] (CYZ) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:12 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4818433] [19-2706] (CYZ) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:07 AM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4837228-2 ] filed by Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse. 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [4839444] [19-2706] (MDS) [Entered: 10/08/2019 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 5 volumes, Location STL, 3 boxes, Comments: 3 sets. [4838849] [19-2706] (MDS) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse, w/service 10/02/2019 [4837261] [19-2706] (MDS) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse. w/service 10/02/2019, Length: 9546 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Caryl Luis, Gary Luis, Gary A. Mentz, Merri L. Vitse and Michael J. Vitse due 10/07/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of RBC Capital Markets, LLC due on 11/01/2019. [4837228] [19-2706] (MDS) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4837172] [19-2706] (EST) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT brief of Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4837170] [19-2706] (EST) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse - w/service 08/27/2019. [4823902] [19-2706] (EST) [Entered: 08/27/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse - Joint Appendix - w/service 08/27/2019 [4823892] [19-2706] (EST) [Entered: 08/27/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case, Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 06/23/2017, No. of Pgs.: 29, Court Reporter: Schuetz, Heather [4822518] [19-2706] (STL) [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse. - FOR CAL [4821427] [19-2706] (GMF) [Entered: 08/21/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Kirsten E. Schubert for Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC w/service 08/14/2019 [4819308] [19-2706] (KS) [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Michael E. Rowe for Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC w/service 08/14/2019 [4818967] [19-2706] (MER) [Entered: 08/14/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Daniel C. Hedlund for Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse w/service 08/13/2019 [4818827] [19-2706] (DCH) [Entered: 08/13/2019 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Eric S. Taubel for Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse w/service 08/13/2019 [4818825] [19-2706] (EST) [Entered: 08/13/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by James K. Langdon for Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC w/service 08/13/2019 [4818806] [19-2706] (JKL) [Entered: 08/13/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Vernon J. Vander Weide for Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse w/service 08/13/2019 [4818620] [19-2706] (GMF) [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Gregg M. Fishbein for Appellants Ms. Caryl Luis, Mr. Gary Luis, Mr. Gary A. Mentz, Ms. Merri L. Vitse and Mr. Michael J. Vitse w/service 08/13/2019 [4818617] [19-2706] (GMF) [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 09/23/2019. Appendix due 10/02/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Caryl Luis, Gary Luis, Gary A. Mentz, Merri L. Vitse and Michael J. Vitse due 10/02/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4818444] [19-2706] (CYZ) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 7/11/19, judgment of 7/12/19 [4818441] [19-2706] (CYZ) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4818433] [19-2706] (CYZ) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.