Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2021 at 06:05:45 (UTC).

Gary Hendershott v. Joel Ostuw

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Gary Hendershott filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Joel Ostuw. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10358

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

JOEL OSTUW

Plaintiff / Appellant

GARY HENDERSHOTT

Delray Beach, FL 33483

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mark Andrew Levy

Attorney at Brinkley Morgan

100 Se 3Rd Ave

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Benjamin Sunshine

Attorney at Brinkley Morgan

100 Se 3Rd Ave

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gary Hendershott

2015 N Federal Hwy Apt 202

Delray Beach, FL 33483

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES - 1 copies] by Party Gary Hendershott. Service date: 03/09/2021 email - Appellant Hendershott; Attorney for Appellee: Levy; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Sunshine. [Entered: 03/09/2021 12:14 PM]

Open Document #3

Appellant Appendix

Open Document #2

Appellant Appendix Cover Letter

Open Document #1

Appellant Brief

Open Document #2

Record on Appeal

Open Document #1

Appellant Brief

Open Document

ORDER: Appellants Motion to Stay Final Judgment is DENIED. Appellant has not made the requisite showing. See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418, 434 (2009). [ # 9306871-2 ] BCG, RJL and ALB (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:11 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mark Andrew Levy for Appellee Joel Ostuw. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10358] (ECF: Mark Levy) [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:04 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion to stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Gary Hendershott [ # 9306871-2 ] filed by Attorney Mark Andrew Levy for Appellee Joel Ostuw. [21-10358] (ECF: Mark Levy) [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:25 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Gary Hendershott. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/15/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:18 AM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit

Open Document #1

Motion to stay appeal

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Gary Hendershott. [Entered: 02/11/2021 11:23 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Gary Hendershott. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 02/11/2021 10:55 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark Andrew Levy for Joel Ostuw. [21-10358] (ECF: Mark Levy) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:06 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 02/01/2021 as to Appellant Gary Hendershott. [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:07 AM]

Open Document #4

USDC Order- doc #181

Open Document #3

USDC Order- doc #180

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket14-Day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Mark Andrew Levy for Appellee Joel Ostuw. Appellee's Brief due on 04/22/2021 as to Appellee Joel Ostuw.. [Entered: 04/01/2021 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Gary Hendershott. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 03/16/2021 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Gary Hendershott. [Entered: 03/16/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppendix filed [1 VOLUMES - 1 copies] by Party Gary Hendershott. Service date: 03/09/2021 email - Appellant Hendershott; Attorney for Appellee: Levy; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Sunshine. [Entered: 03/09/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTERED IN ERROR. . Appellant's brief filed by Gary Hendershott. [21-10358]--[Edited 03/09/2021 by MLM] (ECF: Gary Hendershott) [Entered: 03/09/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Gary Hendershott. [21-10358] (ECF: Gary Hendershott) [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Appellants Motion to Stay Final Judgment is DENIED. Appellant has not made the requisite showing. See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418, 434 (2009). [ # 9306871-2 ] BCG, RJL and ALB (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mark Andrew Levy for Appellee Joel Ostuw. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10358] (ECF: Mark Levy) [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Mark Andrew Levy for Joel Ostuw. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Motion to stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Gary Hendershott [ # 9306871-2 ] filed by Attorney Mark Andrew Levy for Appellee Joel Ostuw. [21-10358] (ECF: Mark Levy) [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Gary Hendershott. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/15/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Gary Hendershott. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9306871-1] [Entered: 02/11/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Gary Hendershott. [Entered: 02/11/2021 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Gary Hendershott. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 02/11/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark Andrew Levy for Joel Ostuw. [21-10358] (ECF: Mark Levy) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 02/01/2021 as to Appellant Gary Hendershott. [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Gary Hendershott on 02/01/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/16/2021 as to Appellant Gary Hendershott. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/02/2021 as to Appellee Joel Ostuw [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less