This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2019 at 06:02:07 (UTC).

Gary Hatter v. Gloria Williams, et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 Gary Hatter filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gloria Williams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2453

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GLORIA WILLIAMS

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF CHAMPAIGN COUNTY

MEDRA SEALS

EDWARD BLAND

Plaintiff / Appellant

GARY HATTER

Mahomet, IL 61853

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Gregory C. Ray

Attorney at CRAIG & CRAIG

1807 Broadway Avenue, P.O. Box 689

Mattoon, IL 61938-0689

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gary Hatter

P.O. Box 1033

Mahomet, IL 61853

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Attachment filed with Motion for In Forma Pauperis

12 #1

Amended Motion for In Forma Pauperis

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Mr. Gary Hatter. [10] [7026029] [19-2453] (ER) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:25 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed Appellant Mr. Gary Hatter statement of information to the judge. [9] [7026028] [19-2453] (ER) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:25 PM]

8 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

#7

(#7) ORDER: re: Motion for request to become an electronic filer. [ # 6 ] The motion is GRANTED. Appellant Gary Hatter is granted leave to use the Electronic Case Filing system for filing material in this appeal. This courts Electronic Case Filing Procedures, the Electronic Case Filing User Manual, and answers to frequently asked questions regarding Electronic Case Filing are available at the Seventh Circuits website: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov. The court will terminate the pro se litigant's filing user status upon the termination of the case, termination of the litigant's pro se status, or for any abuse of filing privileges. JLW [7] [7025444] [19-2453] (CG) [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:18 AM]

#6

(#6) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Gary Hatter to become an electronic filer. [6] [7025010] [19-2453] (VG) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:25 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER: re: Motion for extended time. [ # 4 ].The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the appellant shall file the transcript information sheet, if one is necessary, by August 30, 2019. CMD [5] [7023944] [19-2453] (CG) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:27 PM]

#4

(#4) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Gary Hatter to extend time to file transcript information sheet. [4] [7023646] [19-2453] (PS) [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:37 PM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Gloria Williams, Edward Bland and Housing Authority of Champaign County. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7023618] [19-2453] (Ray, Gregory) [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:56 PM]

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Gary Hatter. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7023056] [19-2453] (CG) [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:22 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Amended Prose motion filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Hatter to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [12] [7028857] [19-2453] (MM) [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Prose motion filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Hatter to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [11] [7027856] [19-2453] (AP) [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Mr. Gary Hatter. [10] [7026029] [19-2453] (ER) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed Appellant Mr. Gary Hatter statement of information to the judge. [9] [7026028] [19-2453] (ER) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Mr. Gary Hatter leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 08/26/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 09/25/2019 for Appellant Gary Hatter [7025984] [8] [7025984] [19-2453] (CG) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: re: Motion for request to become an electronic filer. [ # 6 ] The motion is GRANTED. Appellant Gary Hatter is granted leave to use the Electronic Case Filing system for filing material in this appeal. This courts Electronic Case Filing Procedures, the Electronic Case Filing User Manual, and answers to frequently asked questions regarding Electronic Case Filing are available at the Seventh Circuits website: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov. The court will terminate the pro se litigant's filing user status upon the termination of the case, termination of the litigant's pro se status, or for any abuse of filing privileges. JLW [7] [7025444] [19-2453] (CG) [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Gary Hatter to become an electronic filer. [6] [7025010] [19-2453] (VG) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: re: Motion for extended time. [ # 4 ].The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the appellant shall file the transcript information sheet, if one is necessary, by August 30, 2019. CMD [5] [7023944] [19-2453] (CG) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Gary Hatter to extend time to file transcript information sheet. [4] [7023646] [19-2453] (PS) [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Gloria Williams, Edward Bland and Housing Authority of Champaign County. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7023618] [19-2453] (Ray, Gregory) [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Gary Hatter. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7023056] [19-2453] (CG) [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Gary Hatter by 08/07/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 08/14/2019. [1] [7020863] [19-2453] (AG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.