This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/28/2021 at 17:24:14 (UTC).

Gary Alexander, et al v. United Behavioral Health

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Gary Alexander filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Behavioral Health. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15194

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

MICHAEL DRISCOLL

Defendant / Appellant

UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH

Plaintiff / Appellees

GARY ALEXANDER, on his own behalf and on behalf of his beneficiary son, Jordan Alexander

CORINNA KLEIN

DAVID HAFFNER, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Amicus Curiae

AMERICA'S HEALTH INSURANCE PLANS (AHIP)

SECRETARY OF LABOR

NATIONAL HEALTH LAW PROGRAM, et al.

ASSOCIATION OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTH AND WELLNESS

AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PSYCHIATRIC SOCIETY, NORTHERN CALIFORNIA PSYCHIATRIC SOCIETY, ORANGE COUNTY PSYCHIATRIC SOCIETY, CENTRAL CALIFORNIA PSYCHIATRIC SOCIET

CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Caroline E. Reynolds

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Brian Hufford

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

485 Madison Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Meiram Bendat

Attorney at Psych-Appeal, Inc

7 West Figueroa Street, Suite 300, Pmb #300059

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Adam Abelson

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

100 E. Pratt Street, Suite 2440

Baltimore, MD 21202

Andrew N. Goldfarb

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Jason Cowart

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

485 Madison Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

David A. Reiser

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

April N. Ross

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Miguel A. Estrada

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Jennifer S. Romano

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

515 South Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nathaniel Philip Bualat

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Thomas F. Koegel

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrew Holmer

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

515 South Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Geoffrey Manson Sigler Esquire

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Lucas C. Townsend

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Matthew Rozen

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Michael B. Kimberly

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 N Capitol Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Melissa Moore

Attorney at LABR - U.S. Department of Labor

200 Constitution Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20210

Andrew John Pincus

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Martine D'Agostino

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the Attorney General

1515 Clay Street

Oakland, CA 94612

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

74 #2

Attachment

74 #1

Main Document

#72

#71

#70

#69

#64

#63

#61

#60

#59

#53

#51

#50

#49

#48

#46

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#76) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Miguel A. Estrada for Appellant United Behavioral Health in 20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194. Hearing in San Francisco on 08/11/2021 at 09:00 A.M. (Courtroom: 1). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 20.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 06/28/2021. [12155671] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 06/28/2021 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#75) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Caroline E. Reynolds for Appellees Gary Alexander, Lori Flanzraich, David Haffner, Cecilia Holdnak, Mary Jones, Corinna Klein, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Linda Tillitt, David Wit and Natasha Wit in 20-17363, Attorney Caroline E. Reynolds for Appellees Gary Alexander, Corinna Klein, David Haffner and Michael Driscoll in 20-17364, Attorney Caroline E. Reynolds for Appellees David Wit, Natasha Wit, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Lori Flanzraich, Cecilia Holdnak, Gary Alexander, Corinna Klein, David Haffner, Linda Tillitt and Mary Jones in 21-15193, 21-15194. Hearing in San Francisco on 08/11/2021 at 09:00 A.M. (Courtroom: 1). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 20.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 06/25/2021. [12155186] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194] (Reynolds, Caroline) [Entered: 06/25/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Filed (ECF) Appellees Gary Alexander, Lori Flanzraich, David Haffner, Cecilia Holdnak, Corinna Klein, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Linda Tillitt, David Wit and Natasha Wit in 20-17363, Appellees Gary Alexander, Michael Driscoll, David Haffner and Corinna Klein in 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/25/2021. [12154372] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194] (Reynolds, Caroline) [Entered: 06/25/2021 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#73) Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [12153959] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (SML) [Entered: 06/24/2021 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Filed clerk order: The redacted answering brief [ # 71 ] submitted by appellees is filed. No paper copies are required. [12153719] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (SML) [Entered: 06/24/2021 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Gary Alexander, Lori Flanzraich, David Haffner, Cecilia Holdnak, Corinna Klein, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Linda Tillitt, David Wit and Natasha Wit in 20-17363, Appellees Gary Alexander, Michael Driscoll, David Haffner and Corinna Klein in 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194. Date of service: 06/24/2021. [12153548] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194] (Reynolds, Caroline) [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Filed (ECF) Appellant United Behavioral Health in 20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194 Correspondence: Response to Plaintiffs-Appellees' June 21, 2021 Correspondence Regarding Reply Brief. Date of service: 06/22/2021 [12151028] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 06/22/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Filed (ECF) Appellees Gary Alexander, Lori Flanzraich, David Haffner, Cecilia Holdnak, Corinna Klein, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Linda Tillitt, David Wit and Natasha Wit in 20-17363, Appellees Gary Alexander, Michael Driscoll, David Haffner and Corinna Klein in 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194 Correspondence: Regarding Reply Brief. Date of service: 06/21/2021 [12148590] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194] (Reynolds, Caroline) [Entered: 06/21/2021 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#68) Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [42] filed UNDER SEAL by Appellees. (sent to panel) [12146158] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (SD) [Entered: 06/16/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#67) Received 3 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 39 ], [43] in 3 volume(s) (Volume 3 UNDER SEAL) and index volume filed by Appellees. (sent to panel) [12146068] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (KWG) [Entered: 06/16/2021 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) The unopposed motions to consolidate (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 11949846-2 ] and [ # 11996598-2 ] in 20-17363) are granted. Appeal Nos. 20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, and 21-15194 are consolidated. Appellants motion for a stay of the district courts claims reprocessing order pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 11952313-2 ] in 20-17363) is granted. See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418, 434 (2009). The consolidated opening brief is due March 15, 2021. The consolidated answering brief is due April 14, 2021. The optional consolidated reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The Clerk shall place these appeals on the calendar for August 2021. [12002470] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2021 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellant United Behavioral Health Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/12/2021. [12002379] [21-15194] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 02/12/2021 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12001017] (LW) [Entered: 02/11/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant United Behavioral Health Unopposed Motion to consolidate cases 20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194. Date of service: 02/08/2021. [11996615] [21-15194] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorneys Miguel A. Estrada, Geoffrey Manson Sigler, Lucas C. Townsend and Matthew Rozen for Appellant United Behavioral Health, in case 21-15194. [11995018] (HH) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew S. Rozen (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 02/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11994984] [21-15194] (Rozen, Matthew) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lucas C. Townsend (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 02/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11994976] [21-15194] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Geoffrey M. Sigler (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 02/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11994964] [21-15194] (Sigler, Geoffrey) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Miguel A. Estrada (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 02/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11994950] [21-15194] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant United Behavioral Health Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/10/2021. Appellant United Behavioral Health opening brief due 04/05/2021. Appellees Gary Alexander, Michael Driscoll, David Haffner and Corinna Klein answering brief due 05/05/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11991021] (JBS) [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Health Law Program is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary of Labor Eugene Scalia is a litigant

Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL B. KIMBERLY