This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 06:04:37 (UTC).

Gary Adams v. American Optical Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Gary Adams filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Optical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1609

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

COAST HOLDINGS, INCORPORATED

3M COMPANY, as successor by merger to Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company and/or its predecessors/successors in interest

Plaintiff / Appellant

GARY ADAMS

Defendant / Appellees

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Blair Martin

Attorney at MARTIN WALTON LAW FIRM

1335 Space Park Drive

Houston, TX 77058

Zane Thomas Cagle

Attorney at CAGLE LAW FIRM

500 North Broadway

St. Louis, MO 63102

Marc Michael Rose

Attorney at MARC M. ROSE ATTORNEY AT LAW

777 Main Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Gage Walton

Attorney at MARTIN WALTON LAW FIRM

1335 Space Park Drive

Houston, TX 77058

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Carol Dan Browning

Attorney at STITES & HARBISON, PLLC

400 West Market Street

Louisville, KY 40202-0000

Shawn David Golden

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

405 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

Whitney Frazier Watt

Attorney at STITES & HARBISON, PLLC

400 West Market Street

Louisville, KY 40202-0000

Robert Emmett Scully Jr.

Attorney at STITES & HARBISON, PLLC

1800 Diagonal Road

Alexandria, VA 22206

Scott Jason Wilkov

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Emily L. Startsman

Attorney at STITES & HARBISON, PLLC

250 West Main Street

Lexington, KY 40507-1758

Bethany A. Breetz

Attorney at STITES & HARBISON, PLLC

400 West Market Street

Louisville, KY 40202-0000

Chad Michael Eggspuehler

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Milton Trent Spurlock

Attorney at DINSMORE & SHOHL LLP

101 South 5Th Street

Louisville, KY 40202

Amanda McFarland Lockaby

Attorney at DINSMORE & SHOHL LLP

205 West Main Street

Lexington, KY 40515

Donald E. Santarelli Esq.

Attorney at DINSMORE & SHOHL LLP

801 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/19/2019. Response Brief due 09/18/2019. [19-1609] EB [Entered: 07/08/2019 08:43 AM]

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marc Michael Rose for Gary Adams. [1000539112] [19-1609] Marc Rose [Entered: 06/29/2019 09:57 AM]

14 #2

Transcript order form

14 #1

Acknowledgment

#13

(#13) Docket correction requested from Gary Adams. Re: [ # 12 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. Mailed to: Carol Dan Browning; Zane Thomas Cagle; Shawn David Golden; Amanda McFarland Lockaby; Michael B. Martin; Marc Michael Rose; Milton Trent Spurlock; Emily L. Startsman; Gage Walton; Whitney Frazier Watt; Scott Jason Wilkov. [19-1609] EB [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:53 PM]

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Gary Adams. [19-1609] Michael Martin [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:47 PM]

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Gary Adams. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000534997] [19-1609] Michael Martin [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:46 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael B. Martin for Gary Adams. [1000534996] [19-1609] Michael Martin [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:45 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by American Optical Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000534179] [19-1609] Bethany Breetz [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:15 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Carol Dan Browning for American Optical Corporation. [1000534139] [19-1609] Carol Browning [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:49 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Mine Safety Appliances Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000534059] [19-1609] Milton Spurlock [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:10 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Milton Trent Spurlock for Mine Safety Appliances Company. [1000534050] [19-1609] Milton Spurlock [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:03 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Chad M. Eggspuehler for American Optical Corporation. [1000532221] [19-1609] Chad Eggspuehler [Entered: 06/18/2019 01:03 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bethany A. Breetz for American Optical Corporation. [1000532103] [19-1609] Bethany Breetz [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:28 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-00027-JPJ-PMS. Mailed to: Carol Dan Browning; Zane Thomas Cagle; Shawn David Golden; Amanda McFarland Lockaby; Michael B. Martin; Marc Michael Rose; Milton Trent Spurlock; Emily L. Startsman; Gage Walton; Whitney Frazier Watt; Scott Jason Wilkov. [19-1609] EB [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:43 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-00027-JPJ-PMS. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-1609] EB [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:35 AM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/19/2019. Response Brief due 09/18/2019. [19-1609] EB [Entered: 07/08/2019 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marc Michael Rose for Gary Adams. [1000539112] [19-1609] Marc Rose [Entered: 06/29/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Donna J. Prather. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motions Hearing- 05/17/2019. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Gary Adams. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-00027-JPJ-PMS. Transcript due from Donna J. Prather, Official Court Reporter on 08/30/2019. [19-1609] EB [Entered: 06/24/2019 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Docket correction requested from Gary Adams. Re: [ # 12 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. Mailed to: Carol Dan Browning; Zane Thomas Cagle; Shawn David Golden; Amanda McFarland Lockaby; Michael B. Martin; Marc Michael Rose; Milton Trent Spurlock; Emily L. Startsman; Gage Walton; Whitney Frazier Watt; Scott Jason Wilkov. [19-1609] EB [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marc Michael Rose for Gary Adams. [1000535001] [19-1609]--[Edited 06/21/2019 by EB] Michael Martin [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Gary Adams. [19-1609] Michael Martin [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Gary Adams. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000534997] [19-1609] Michael Martin [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael B. Martin for Gary Adams. [1000534996] [19-1609] Michael Martin [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by American Optical Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000534179] [19-1609] Bethany Breetz [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Carol Dan Browning for American Optical Corporation. [1000534139] [19-1609] Carol Browning [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Mine Safety Appliances Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000534059] [19-1609] Milton Spurlock [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Milton Trent Spurlock for Mine Safety Appliances Company. [1000534050] [19-1609] Milton Spurlock [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Chad M. Eggspuehler for American Optical Corporation. [1000532221] [19-1609] Chad Eggspuehler [Entered: 06/18/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bethany A. Breetz for American Optical Corporation. [1000532103] [19-1609] Bethany Breetz [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-00027-JPJ-PMS. Mailed to: Carol Dan Browning; Zane Thomas Cagle; Shawn David Golden; Amanda McFarland Lockaby; Michael B. Martin; Marc Michael Rose; Milton Trent Spurlock; Emily L. Startsman; Gage Walton; Whitney Frazier Watt; Scott Jason Wilkov. [19-1609] EB [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-00027-JPJ-PMS. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-1609] EB [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MINE SAFETY APPLICANCES COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitney Frazier Watt