This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/25/2022 at 05:16:39 (UTC).

Garrett v. McDonough

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Garrett filed an Other lawsuit against McDonough. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1182

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Claimant

VERNON JUNIOR GARRETT

Respondent / Appellee

DENIS MCDONOUGH, Secretary of Veterans Affairs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

Adam R. Luck

Attorney at GloverLuck, LLP

1700 Pacific Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/16/2022. [886305] Entry of Appearance due 12/07/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/07/2022. Docketing Statement due 12/23/2022. Appellant's brief is due 01/23/2023. [EKD] [Entered: 11/23/2022 09:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less