This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2019 at 06:05:37 (UTC).

Gachette v. Metro North-High Bridge

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Gachette filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Metro North-High Bridge. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-330

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Louis Gachette

Brooklyn, NY 11210

Defendant / Appellees

Preston Kirk

Metro North-High Bridge

Dave Plumb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Louis Gachette

620 East 29Th Street

Brooklyn, NY 11210

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jonathan Meinen Esq.

Attorney at Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company

420 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10170

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Louis Gachette Brief due date as 05/20/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 05/20/2019, copy to pro se, FILED.[2523963] [19-330] [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:07 PM]

#18

(#18) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2522460] [19-330] [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:33 PM]

#12

(#12) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Louis Gachette, informing Court of proposed due date 05/20/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/23/2019 by US mail.[2505556] [19-330] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:51 PM]

#11

(#11) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant Louis Gachette, FILED. Service date 02/23/2019 by US mail. [2505552] [19-330] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:47 PM]

#10

(#10) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Louis Gachette, FILED. Service date 02/23/2019 by US mail.[2505550] [19-330] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:44 PM]

8 #2

Supporting Document

8 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#7

(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2491386] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:46 AM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/09/2019, RECEIVED.[2491364] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:27 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2491361] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:26 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Louis Gachette Brief due date as 05/20/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 05/20/2019, copy to pro se, FILED.[2523963] [19-330] [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2522460] [19-330] [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Louis Gachette, informing Court of proposed due date 05/20/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/23/2019 by US mail.[2505556] [19-330] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant Louis Gachette, FILED. Service date 02/23/2019 by US mail. [2505552] [19-330] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Louis Gachette, FILED. Service date 02/23/2019 by US mail.[2505550] [19-330] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Louis Gachette, FILED. Service date 02/23/2019 by US mail.[2505549] [19-330] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Metro North-High Bridge, Dave Plumb and Preston Kirk, FILED. Service date 02/19/2019 by US mail.[2499935] [19-330] [Entered: 02/19/2019 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2491386] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/06/2019, granting IFP, RECEIVED.[2491385] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2491371] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2491367] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/09/2019, RECEIVED.[2491364] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2491361] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Louis Gachette, FILED. [2491357] [19-330] [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less