This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2020 at 06:20:33 (UTC).

Gabriel v. El Paso Combined Courts, et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Gabriel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against El Paso Combined Courts. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1020

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DANIEL H. MAY, individually and in his official capacity as District Attorney

JOHN PARCELL, as an employee

GWEN PRATOR, individually and as employee of David Shakes

DAVID GUEST, individually and as an employee

BECCA KINIKIN, as an employee

ADAM BAILEY, individually and as an employee

DAVID LEE SHAKES, individually and in his official capacity Judge of El Paso Combined Courts

EL PASO COMBINED COURTS

Plaintiff / Appellant

VINCENT GABRIEL

Springfield, MA 01101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mary Margaret Ritchie

Attorney at El Paso County Attorney

200 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 150

Colorado Springs, CO 80903-2208

Bryan E. Schmid

Attorney at El Paso County Attorney

200 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 150

Colorado Springs, CO 80903-2208

Andrew M. Katarikawe Esq.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Vincent Gabriel

P.O. Box 4991

Springfield, MA 01101

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10725693] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellant's Motion for Court to Accept & File Attachments filed 3/8/20; State Appellees' Response filed 3/10/20; Appellant's Reply filed 3/11/20; County Appellees' Response filed 3/13/20; and Appellant's Reply filed 3/14/20 [ # 10723563-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time); [ # 10724446-2 ][ # 10725364-2 ][ # 10725615-2 ] Served on 03/16/2020. [20-1020] [Entered: 03/16/2020 09:31 AM]

Open Document

[10725615] Reply filed by Mr. Vincent Gabriel to Appellees' Reply to County Defendants/Appellees Objections. Served on 03/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1020] VG [Entered: 03/14/2020 11:48 AM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit A

Open Document #1

County Appellee's Response

Open Document

[10724446] Reply filed by Mr. Vincent Gabriel to Appellees' Response to Oppose Appellant's Exhibits A-12. Served on 03/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1020] VG [Entered: 03/11/2020 09:55 AM]

Open Document

[10724239] Response filed by El Paso Combined Courts, Gwen Prator and David Lee Shakes to Appellee's Motion for Court to Accept and File Attachments. Served on 03/10/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1020] AMK [Entered: 03/10/2020 02:07 PM]

Open Document

[10723739] Order filed by Clerk of the Court, response to appellant's motion for court to accept and file attachments due on 03/13/2020 for Adam Bailey, El Paso Combined Courts, David Guest, Becca Kinikin, Daniel H. May, John Parcell, Gwen Prator and David Lee Shakes. If no response is filed, the court will deem the motion as unopposed. Served on 03/09/2020. [20-1020] [Entered: 03/09/2020 12:05 PM]

Open Document #2

Important and Sequencial Exhibits to Aid the Brief

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Volume II Pleadings

Open Document #1

Volume I Pleadings

Open Document

[10713344] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 03/09/2020 for Vincent Gabriel. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 02/18/2020 [20-1020] [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:07 PM]

Open Document

[10713306] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Vincent Gabriel for permission to file electronically. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1020] [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:45 PM]

Open Document #2

Main Document

Open Document #1

Notice

Open Document

[10712716] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew M. Katarikawe, Esq. for El Paso Combined Courts, David Lee Shakes and Gwen Prator. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1020] [Entered: 01/24/2020 12:18 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket[10725699] Minute order filed - Appellees' brief now due 04/15/2020 for Adam Bailey, El Paso Combined Courts, David Guest, Becca Kinikin, Daniel H. May, John Parcell, Gwen Prator and David Lee Shakes. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1020] [Entered: 03/16/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10725693] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellant's Motion for Court to Accept & File Attachments filed 3/8/20; State Appellees' Response filed 3/10/20; Appellant's Reply filed 3/11/20; County Appellees' Response filed 3/13/20; and Appellant's Reply filed 3/14/20 [ # 10723563-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time); [ # 10724446-2 ][ # 10725364-2 ][ # 10725615-2 ] Served on 03/16/2020. [20-1020] [Entered: 03/16/2020 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10725615] Reply filed by Mr. Vincent Gabriel to Appellees' Reply to County Defendants/Appellees Objections. Served on 03/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1020] VG [Entered: 03/14/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10725364] Response filed by Adam Bailey, David Guest, Becca Kinikin, Daniel H. May and John Parcell to Appellant's Motion for Court to Accept and File Attachments. Served on 03/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1020] BES [Entered: 03/13/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10724446] Reply filed by Mr. Vincent Gabriel to Appellees' Response to Oppose Appellant's Exhibits A-12. Served on 03/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1020] VG [Entered: 03/11/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10724239] Response filed by El Paso Combined Courts, Gwen Prator and David Lee Shakes to Appellee's Motion for Court to Accept and File Attachments. Served on 03/10/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1020] AMK [Entered: 03/10/2020 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10723739] Order filed by Clerk of the Court, response to appellant's motion for court to accept and file attachments due on 03/13/2020 for Adam Bailey, El Paso Combined Courts, David Guest, Becca Kinikin, Daniel H. May, John Parcell, Gwen Prator and David Lee Shakes. If no response is filed, the court will deem the motion as unopposed. Served on 03/09/2020. [20-1020] [Entered: 03/09/2020 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10723563] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Vincent Gabriel to court to accept & file attachments to brief. Served on: 03/08/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1020]--[Edited 03/09/2020 by LG to correct relief sought] VG [Entered: 03/08/2020 11:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10723256] Proposed attachments to opening brief labeled Exhibits Packet A - 12 received from Mr. Vincent Gabriel but not filed pursuant to the court's 03/06/2020 order. [20-1020] [Entered: 03/06/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10723253] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on review of appellant's opening brief, which was filed through the court's electronic filing system. The brief itself is complaint with our rules. The first and second sets of attachments are likewise acceptable. But the third set of attachments, labeled Exhibits Packet A - 12, cannot be accepted for filing at this time, for the reasons stated in the attached order. If the appellant would like the court to consider the documents in the third set of attachments to his brief, he must file a motion requesting this relief and explain why on or before 03/16/2020. If no motion is filed by that date, the third set of attachments will not be filed. Briefing on the merits is tolled pending resolution of the issue described in the attached order. Served on 03/06/2020. [20-1020] [Entered: 03/06/2020 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10714791] Certificate of service filed by Mr. Vincent Gabriel. Document served: Interested Parties. Served on 02/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1020] VG [Entered: 02/01/2020 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713469] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion for permission to file electronically. Please see order for additional detailed information. Served on 01/28/2020. [20-1020] [Entered: 01/28/2020 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713454] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2, Comments: Volume 1-pleadings, Volume 2-pleadings. [20-1020] [Entered: 01/28/2020 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713344] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 03/09/2020 for Vincent Gabriel. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 02/18/2020 [20-1020] [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket[10713340] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 01/27/2020. [20-1020] [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713306] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Vincent Gabriel for permission to file electronically. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1020] [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713304] Notice for use of email notifications filed by Mr. Vincent Gabriel. Served on 01/22/2020 by US mail. [20-1020] [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712716] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew M. Katarikawe, Esq. for El Paso Combined Courts, David Lee Shakes and Gwen Prator. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1020] [Entered: 01/24/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket[10712711] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew Katarikawe for Appellees El Paso Combined Courts, David Lee Shakes and Gwen Prator for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1020] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 01/24/2020 by NA] AMK [Entered: 01/24/2020 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10711547] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/21/2020. Fee or ifp forms due 02/20/2020 for Vincent Gabriel. Notice of appearance due on 02/04/2020 for Adam Bailey, El Paso Combined Courts, David Guest, Becca Kinikin, Daniel H. May, John Parcell, Gwen Prator and David Lee Shakes, and Notice of appearance due on 02/20/2020 for Vincent Gabriel. [20-1020] [Entered: 01/21/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less