This case was last updated from PACER on 05/22/2020 at 06:09:05 (UTC).

Gabriel Eckard v. Daniel Sites

Case Summary

On 03/23/2020 Gabriel Eckard filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Daniel Sites. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-35268

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

GABRIEL ECKARD

Walla Walla, WA 99362

Defendant / Appellee

DANIEL SITES, Deputy, Snohomish County Jail

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gabriel Eckard

Attorney at WSP - WASHINGTON STATE PENITENTIARY - WALLA WALLA

1313 North 13Th Ave.

Walla Walla, WA 99362

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Geoffrey Alan Enns

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

Margaret A. Duncan

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Declaration of Geoffrey A. Enns

5 #1

Response to Motion for Extension of Time and Appointment of Counsel

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Gabriel Eckard motion for extension of time on all pending deadlines, motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/13/2020. [11681650] (QDL) [Entered: 05/05/2020 04:53 PM]

3 #2

Additional Document

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11640901] (CKP) [Entered: 03/25/2020 04:28 AM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee Daniel Sites response to motion ([ # 4 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 05/15/2020. [11692020] [20-35268] (Enns, Geoffrey) [Entered: 05/15/2020 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Gabriel Eckard motion for extension of time on all pending deadlines, motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/13/2020. [11681650] (QDL) [Entered: 05/05/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): On March 25, 2020, this court ordered appellant to complete and file with this court the enclosed prisoner authorization form. To date, appellant has not complied with the March 25, 2020 order. Within 60 days after the date of this order, appellant shall sign and file with this court the enclosed prisoner authorization form. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The opening brief is due June 29, 2020; the answering brief is due July 29, 2020; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The Clerk shall send a copy of the March 25, 2020 order to appellant along with this order. [11675980] (CKP) [Entered: 04/29/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11640901] (CKP) [Entered: 03/25/2020 04:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Gabriel Eckard opening brief due 05/19/2020. Appellee Daniel Sites answering brief due 06/18/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11639101] (JMR) [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margaret A. Duncan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey A Enns