This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2019 at 06:22:24 (UTC).

Furtado v. Oberg, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 Furtado filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Oberg. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1245

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

AMY OBERG

DARROW EVERETT LLP

AMY PAGE OBERG

Interested Parties

CHARLES TAMULEVITZ

CHRISTINE BAGLIONI

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAY FURTADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Interested Party Attorneys

Jennifer L. Markowski

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP

60 State St, Ste 600

Boston, MA 02109

William Robert Covino

Attorney at Peabody & Arnold LLP

600 Atlantic Ave

Boston, MA 02210-2261

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Thomas R. Noel

203 S Main St

Providence, RI 02903-2992

John R. Harrington

203 S Main St

Providence, RI 02903-2992

Lyndsey Fiore

203 S Main St

Providence, RI 02903-2992

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: John R. Harrington for Jay Furtado. [19-1245] (GRC) [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:07 PM]

Open Document #1

Transcript Report/Order Form

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jay Furtado filed by Attorney Thomas R. Noel. Certificate of service dated 03/21/2019. [19-1245] (TRN) [Entered: 03/21/2019 10:41 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Jay Furtado indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [19-1245] (TRN) [Entered: 03/29/2019 08:10 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jay Furtado filed by Attorney Lyndsey A. Fiore. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2019. [19-1245] (LF) [Entered: 04/02/2019 11:56 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Jay Furtado. Certificate of service dated 03/21/2019. [19-1245] (TRN) [Entered: 03/21/2019 10:43 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 04/23/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: John R. Harrington for Jay Furtado. [19-1245] (GRC) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:44 PM]

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: John R. Harrington for Jay Furtado. [19-1245] (GRC) [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 04/23/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: John R. Harrington for Jay Furtado. [19-1245] (GRC) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jay Furtado filed by Attorney Lyndsey A. Fiore. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2019. [19-1245] (LF) [Entered: 04/02/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Jay Furtado indicating the following transcript is being ordered: 12/13/2018, Summary Judgment Hrg. Transcript due 05/28/2019 from Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky. [19-1245] (MH) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Jay Furtado indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [19-1245] (TRN) [Entered: 03/29/2019 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Jay Furtado. Certificate of service dated 03/21/2019. [19-1245] (TRN) [Entered: 03/21/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jay Furtado filed by Attorney Thomas R. Noel. Certificate of service dated 03/21/2019. [19-1245] (TRN) [Entered: 03/21/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #91) filed by Appellant Jay Furtado. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/28/2019. [19-1245] (GRC) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less