This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2019 at 06:07:02 (UTC).

Fulgiam v. Kenneway

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Fulgiam filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Kenneway. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1292

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

STEVEN KENNEWAY, Superintendent, MCI Shirley, Medium

Petitioner / Appellant

EARL FULGIAM

Norfolk, MA 02056-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Thomas E. Bocian

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Elizabeth D. Caddick

3 Bessom St

Marblehead, MA 01945

Earl Fulgiam

Attorney at MCI Norfolk

Po Box 43

Norfolk, MA 02056-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: March 8, 2019. [19-1292] (GK) [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:34 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Earl Fulgiam. Certificate of service dated 04/25/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:57 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Earl Fulgiam indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:58 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Earl Fulgiam. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:57 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Earl Fulgiam filed by Attorney Elizabeth Caddick. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:56 PM]

Open Document

ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 04/26/2019. Date of denial by district court: March 8, 2019. [19-1292] (TS) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:18 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Earl Fulgiam. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 07:57 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Steven Kenneway filed by Attorney Thomas E. Bocian. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2019. [19-1292] (TEB) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:44 AM]

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: March 8, 2019. [19-1292] (GK) [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Earl Fulgiam. Certificate of service dated 04/25/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Earl Fulgiam indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Earl Fulgiam. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Earl Fulgiam filed by Attorney Elizabeth Caddick. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 04/26/2019. Date of denial by district court: March 8, 2019. [19-1292] (TS) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Earl Fulgiam. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1292] (EDC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 07:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Steven Kenneway filed by Attorney Thomas E. Bocian. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2019. [19-1292] (TEB) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #24) filed by Appellant Earl Fulgiam. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 04/08/2019. [19-1292] (TS) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less