This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/23/2019 at 06:05:49 (UTC).

Friends of Alaska National Wil, et al v. David Bernhardt, et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 Friends of Alaska National Wil filed an Other lawsuit against David Bernhardt. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35451

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellants

CITY OF KING COVE

NATIVE VILLAGE OF BELKOFSKI

AGDAAGUX TRIBAL COUNCIL

CITY OF COLD BAY

ALEUTIANS EAST BOROUGH

KING COVE CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellees

ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE

FRIENDS OF ALASKA NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGES

NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION

NATIONAL AUDUBON SOCIETY

THE WILDERNESS SOCIETY

WILDERNESS WATCH

DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE

CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

SIERRA CLUB

Defendant / Appellants

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR

DAVID BERNHARDT, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of the Interior

UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Katherine Grace Strong

Attorney at Trustees for Alaska

1026 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 201

Anchorage, AK 99501

Brook Marie Brisson

Attorney at Trustees for Alaska

1026 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 201

Anchorage, AK 99501

Valerie L. Brown

Attorney at Trustees for Alaska

1026 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 201

Anchorage, AK 99501

Bridget Psarianos

Attorney at Trustees for Alaska

1026 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 201

Anchorage, AK 99501

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Erika B. Kranz

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Rickey Doyle Turner Jr.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

999 18Th Street, Suite 370 - South Terrace

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SMC) Appellants unopposed motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11371384] (OC) [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:17 AM]

#10

(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellants David Bernhardt, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and USDOI Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 07/16/2019. [11364615] [19-35451] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:04 AM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11326431] (BS) [Entered: 06/11/2019 10:33 AM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 06/17/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11316839] (BS) [Entered: 06/03/2019 10:02 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants David Bernhardt, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and USDOI Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/31/2019. [11314720] [19-35451] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 05/31/2019 07:55 AM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SMC) Appellants unopposed motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11371384] (OC) [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) Appellants David Bernhardt, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and USDOI Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 07/16/2019. [11364615] [19-35451] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#9) Attorney Katherine Grace Strong substituted by Attorney Bridget Psarianos, in 19-35451 [11356518] (CW) [Entered: 07/08/2019 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bridget E. Psarianos (Trustees for Alaska, 1026 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 201, Anchorage, Alaska 99501) for Appellees Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, DOW, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, National Audubon Society, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society and Wilderness Watch. Substitution for Attorney Katherine Grace Strong for Appellees Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, DOW, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, National Audubon Society, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society and Wilderness Watch. Date of service: 07/08/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11356449] [19-35451] (Psarianos, Bridget) [Entered: 07/08/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11326431] (BS) [Entered: 06/11/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 06/17/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11316839] (BS) [Entered: 06/03/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/31/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11315469] (AD) [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants David Bernhardt, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and USDOI Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/31/2019. [11314720] [19-35451] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 05/31/2019 07:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • (#3) Added attorney Erika B. Kranz for USDOI United States Fish and Wildlife Service David Bernhardt. [11312358] (RL) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Erika Barnes Kranz for Appellants David Bernhardt, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and USDOI. Date of service: 05/29/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11312173] [19-35451] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 05/29/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/31/2019. Appellants David Bernhardt, U.S. Department of the Interior and United States Fish and Wildlife Service opening brief due 07/23/2019. Appellees Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, National Audubon Society, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society and Wilderness Watch answering brief due 08/23/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11309348] (RT) [Entered: 05/24/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges is a litigant

Latest cases where Kings Cove Apartments LLC dba Kings Cove Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Alaska Wilderness League is a litigant