This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/07/2022 at 06:03:24 (UTC).

Frederick Banks v. Warden Fort Dix FCI, et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Frederick Banks filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden Fort Dix FCI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1017

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

FREDERICK H. BANKS

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Defendant / Appellees

WARDEN FORT DIX FCI

WARDEN ALLENWOOD FCI LOW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Frederick H. Banks

Attorney at Fort Dix FCI

P.O. Box 2000

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph J. Terz Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

228 Walnut Street, P.O. Box 11754, 220 Federal Building And Courthouse

Harrisburg, PA 17108

D. Brian Simpson Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

228 Walnut Street, P.O. Box 11754, 220 Federal Building And Courthouse

Harrisburg, PA 17108

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

District Court Order

1 #3

District Court Opinion

1 #4

Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

3 #1

Standing Order Excess Pagination

3 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#3

Briefing Info for Pro Se Litigants

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from D. Brian Simpson on behalf of Appellee(s) Warden Fort Dix FCI and Warden Allenwood FCI Low. [22-1017] (DBS) [Entered: 01/14/2022 03:27 PM]

#5

(#5) PRO SE INFORMAL BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Mr. Frederick H. Banks. Pages: 5, Certificate of Service dated 01/14/2022 by US mail. (KEL) [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:30 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellees Warden Allenwood FCI Low and Warden Fort Dix FCI to summarily affirm. Certificate of Service dated 02/17/2022. Service made by US mail. [22-1017] (DBS) [Entered: 02/17/2022 02:00 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER (Clerk) Motion by Appellee for Summary Action with Request to Stay Briefing Schedule. The motion is granted to the extent it seeks the briefing schedule. The motion for summary action with any response filed are referred to a motions panel. If the motion for summary action is denied or referred t othe merits panel, Appellees' brief must be filed and served within thirty (30) days of hte date of the order denying or referring the motion. (CLW) [Entered: 03/01/2022 04:14 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER (Clerk) Motion by Appellee for Summary Action with Request to Stay Briefing Schedule. The motion is granted to the extent it seeks the briefing schedule. The motion for summary action with any response filed are referred to a motions panel. If the motion for summary action is denied or referred t othe merits panel, Appellees' brief must be filed and served within thirty (30) days of hte date of the order denying or referring the motion. (CLW) [Entered: 03/01/2022 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellees Warden Allenwood FCI Low and Warden Fort Dix FCI to summarily affirm. Certificate of Service dated 02/17/2022. Service made by US mail. [22-1017] (DBS) [Entered: 02/17/2022 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE INFORMAL BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Mr. Frederick H. Banks. Pages: 5, Certificate of Service dated 01/14/2022 by US mail. (KEL) [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from D. Brian Simpson on behalf of Appellee(s) Warden Fort Dix FCI and Warden Allenwood FCI Low. [22-1017] (DBS) [Entered: 01/14/2022 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Frederick H. Banks due on or before 02/22/2022. Appendix due on or before 02/22/2022. (CLW) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 01/06/2022 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Frederick H. Banks in District Court No. 1-21-cv-01215. (CLW) [Entered: 01/06/2022 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN ALLENWOOD FCI is a litigant

Latest cases where WARDEN FORT DIX FCI is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D. Brian Simpson Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph J Terz