This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/07/2022 at 06:02:59 (UTC).

Frederick Banks v. Director Central Intelligence Agency, et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Frederick Banks filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Director Central Intelligence Agency. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1650

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

FREDERICK H. BANKS, And on behalf of the Citizens of Ukraine

P.O. Box 2000

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Defendant / Appellees

DIRECTOR CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY

PRESIDENT JOE BIDEN

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE

SECRETARY UNITED STATES ARMY

SECRETARY UNITED STATES NAVY

SECRETARY UNITED STATES MARINES

SECRETARY UNITED STATES AIR FORCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Frederick H. Banks

Attorney at Fort Dix FCI

P.O. Box 2000

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Margaret A. Mahoney Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

402 East State Street

Trenton, NJ 08608

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

District Court Order

1 #3

District Court Opinion

1 #4

Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

3 #1

Standing Order Excess Pagination

3 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#3

Briefing Info for Pro Se Litigants

#4

(#4) PRO SE INFORMAL BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Mr. Frederick H. Banks. Pages: 5, Certificate of Service dated 04/20/2022 by US mail. (KEL) [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:09 PM]

#5

(#5) FOLLOW UP LETTER to J. Andrew Ruymann, Esq. for Secretary United States Department of State, Secretary United States Army, Director Central Intelligence Agency, Secretary United States Navy, Secretary United States Air Force, Joe Biden and Secretary United States Marines requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/10/2022. (CLW) [Entered: 04/26/2022 10:18 AM]

7 #1

Appearance Form

7 #2

Certificate of Service

8 #1

Appearance Form

8 #2

Certificate of Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellees Joe Biden, Director Central Intelligence Agency, Secretary United States Air Force, Secretary United States Army, Secretary United States Department of State, Secretary United States Marines and Secretary United States Navy for Extension of Time to file Response Brief and Supplemental Appendix until/for 30 days. Certificate of Service dated 06/06/2022. Service made by US mail. [22-1650] (JAR) [Entered: 06/06/2022 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Assistant U.S. Attorney Margaret Ann Mahoney on behalf of Appellee(s) Director Central Intelligence Agency, President Joe Biden, Secretary United States Department of State, Secretary United States Army, Secretary United States Navy, Secretary United States Marines, Secretary United States Air Force. [22-1650] (MAM) [Entered: 04/29/2022 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Assistant U.S. Attorney J. Andrew Ruymann on behalf of Appellee(s) Director Central Intelligence Agency, President Joe Biden, Secretary United States Department of State, Secretary United States Army, Secretary United States Navy, Secretary United States Marines, Secretary United States Air Force. [22-1650] (JAR) [Entered: 04/29/2022 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#6) Appellees Joe Biden, Director Central Intelligence Agency, Secretary United States Air Force, Secretary United States Army, Secretary United States Department of State, Secretary United States Marines and Secretary United States Navy verbally granted an extension of time to file brief until 06/06/2022 pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. (JK) [Entered: 04/28/2022 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FOLLOW UP LETTER to J. Andrew Ruymann, Esq. for Secretary United States Department of State, Secretary United States Army, Director Central Intelligence Agency, Secretary United States Navy, Secretary United States Air Force, Joe Biden and Secretary United States Marines requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/10/2022. (CLW) [Entered: 04/26/2022 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE INFORMAL BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Mr. Frederick H. Banks. Pages: 5, Certificate of Service dated 04/20/2022 by US mail. (KEL) [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Frederick H. Banks due on or before 05/23/2022. Appendix due on or before 05/23/2022. (CLW) [Entered: 04/13/2022 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 04/08/2022 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Frederick H. Banks in District Court No. 1-22-cv-01605. (CLW) [Entered: 04/08/2022 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN