This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/27/2021 at 06:06:43 (UTC).

Frank Noonan, et al v. Kathleen Kane, et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Frank Noonan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kathleen Kane. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3614

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PHILADELPHIA DAILY NEWS

KATHLEEN KANE

PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLC

PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK DIGITAL LLC

CHRISTOPHER BRENNAN

MICHAEL MILETTO

Plaintiff / Appellee

E. MARC COSTANZO

Plaintiff / Appellants

RICHARD A. SHEETZ, JR.

RANDY P. FEATHERS

FRANK G. FINA

FRANK NOONAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael A. Schwartz Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Pepper

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Eli M. Segal Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Pepper

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Max O. Bernstein Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Rachel F. Satinsky Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Edward T. Ellis Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Richard R. Harris Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Sean A. Kirkpatrick Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

J. Bart DeLone Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Amy B. Ginensky Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Pepper

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Fortunato N. Perri Esq. Jr.

Attorney at McMonagle Perri McHugh & Mischak

1845 Walnut Street, 19Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Peter J. Scuderi Esq.

2000 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James P. Faunes Esq.

Attorney at Feldman Shepherd Wohlgelernter Tanner Weinstock & Dodig

1845 Walnut Street, 21St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Mark W. Tanner Esq.

Attorney at Feldman Shepherd Wohlgelernter Tanner Weinstock & Dodig

1845 Walnut Street, 21St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#12

#9

#8

#5

#12

#11

#8

#7

1 #9

Case Opening Letter

1 #8

Standing Order Excess Pagination

1 #7

Case Caption

1 #6

District Court Judgment 120120

1 #5

District Court Order 120120

1 #4

District Court Memorandum 120120

1 #3

District Court Order 032918

1 #2

District Court Memorandum 032918

#1

Notice of Appeal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Amy B. Ginensky, Esq. for Philadelphia Media Network LLC, Christopher Brennan and Philadelphia Media Network Digital LLC, Fortunato N. Perri, Jr., Esq. for E. Marc Costanzo, Michael A. Schwartz, Esq. for Philadelphia Daily News, Philadelphia Media Network LLC, Christopher Brennan and Philadelphia Media Network Digital LLC, Peter J. Scuderi, Esq. for E. Marc Costanzo and Eli M. Segal, Esq. for Philadelphia Daily News, Philadelphia Media Network LLC, Christopher Brennan and Philadelphia Media Network Digital LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/27/2021. Disclosure Statement on or before 01/27/2021. (CLW) [Entered: 01/13/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Bart DeLone on behalf of Appellee(s) Kathleen Kane and Michael Miletto. [20-3610, 20-3614] (JBD) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean A. Kirkpatrick on behalf of Appellee(s) Kathleen Kane and Michael Miletto. [20-3610, 20-3614] (SAK) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Randy P. Feathers, Frank G. Fina, Frank Noonan and Richard A. Sheetz, Jr. in 20-3614, Appellees Randy P. Feathers, Frank G. Fina, Frank Noonan and Richard A. Sheetz, Jr. in 20-3610 advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3614, 20-3610] (JPF) [Entered: 01/12/2021 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Randy P. Feathers, Frank G. Fina, Frank Noonan and Richard A. Sheetz, Jr. in 20-3614, Appellees Randy P. Feathers, Frank G. Fina, Frank Noonan and Richard A. Sheetz, Jr. in 20-3610. [20-3614, 20-3610] (JPF) [Entered: 01/12/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James P. Faunes, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Frank Noonan, Randy Feathers, Richard Sheetz, Jr. and Frank Fina. [20-3614, 20-3610] (JPF) [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark W. Tanner, Esquire on behalf of Appellees Frank Noonan, Randy Feathers, Richard Sheetz, Jr. and Frank Fina. [20-3614, 20-3610]--[Edited 01/13/2021 by CLW] (JPF) [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Randy P. Feathers, Frank G. Fina, Frank Noonan and Richard A. Sheetz, Jr. in 20-3614, Appellees Frank Noonan, Richard A. Sheetz, Jr., Randy P. Feathers and Frank G. Fina in 20-3610. [20-3614, 20-3610] (JPF) [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 12/30/2020. (CJG) [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK ORDER consolidating the Appeals at Nos. 20-3610 and 20-3614 for Scheduling, Joint Appendix and Disposition. [20-3610, 20-3614] (AR) [Entered: 12/29/2020 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AR) [Entered: 12/29/2020 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Randy P. Feathers, Frank G. Fina, Frank Noonan and Richard A. Sheetz, Jr. in District Court No. 2-15-cv-06082. (AR) [Entered: 12/29/2020 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK (NEWSPAPERS), LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark W. Tanner Esq.