This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/26/2021 at 06:01:31 (UTC).

Frank Noonan, et al v. Kathleen Kane, et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Frank Noonan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kathleen Kane. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3610

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PHILADELPHIA DAILY NEWS

PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK DIGITAL LLC

KATHLEEN KANE

PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLC

CHRISTOPHER BRENNAN

MICHAEL MILETTO

Plaintiff / Appellees

FRANK NOONAN

RICHARD A. SHEETZ, JR.

FRANK G. FINA

RANDY P. FEATHERS

Plaintiff / Appellant

E. MARC COSTANZO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael A. Schwartz Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Pepper

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Eli M. Segal Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Pepper

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Amy B. Ginensky Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Pepper

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Max O. Bernstein Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Rachel F. Satinsky Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Edward T. Ellis Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Richard R. Harris Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Sean A. Kirkpatrick Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

J. Bart DeLone Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Mark W. Tanner Esq.

Attorney at Feldman Shepherd Wohlgelernter Tanner Weinstock & Dodig

1845 Walnut Street, 21St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James P. Faunes Esq.

Attorney at Feldman Shepherd Wohlgelernter Tanner Weinstock & Dodig

1845 Walnut Street, 21St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Fortunato N. Perri Esq. Jr.

Attorney at McMonagle Perri McHugh & Mischak

1845 Walnut Street, 19Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Peter J. Scuderi Esq.

2000 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

District Court Memorandum

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #4

District Court Judgment

1 #5

Case Caption

1 #6

Standing Order Excess Pagination

1 #7

Case Opening Letter

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#11

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Bart DeLone on behalf of Appellee(s) Kathleen Kane and Michael Miletto. [20-3610, 20-3614] (JBD) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean A. Kirkpatrick on behalf of Appellee(s) Kathleen Kane and Michael Miletto. [20-3610, 20-3614] (SAK) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James P. Faunes, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Frank Noonan, Randy Feathers, Richard Sheetz, Jr. and Frank Fina. [20-3614, 20-3610] (JPF) [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark W. Tanner, Esquire on behalf of Appellees Frank Noonan, Randy Feathers, Richard Sheetz, Jr. and Frank Fina. [20-3614, 20-3610]--[Edited 01/13/2021 by CLW] (JPF) [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Max O. Bernstein, Esq. for Michael Miletto and Kathleen Kane, Edward T. Ellis, Esq. for Michael Miletto and Kathleen Kane, Amy B. Ginensky, Esq. for Philadelphia Media Network LLC, Christopher Brennan and Philadelphia Media Network Digital LLC, Richard R. Harris, Esq. for Michael Miletto and Kathleen Kane, Rachel F. Satinsky, Esq. for Michael Miletto and Kathleen Kane, Michael A. Schwartz, Esq. for Philadelphia Daily News, Philadelphia Media Network LLC, Christopher Brennan and Philadelphia Media Network Digital LLC, Eli M. Segal, Esq. for Philadelphia Daily News, Philadelphia Media Network LLC, Christopher Brennan and Philadelphia Media Network Digital LLC and Mark W. Tanner, Esq. for Richard A. Sheetz, Jr., Randy P. Feathers, Frank Noonan and Frank G. Fina requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/26/2021. Disclosure Statement on or before 01/26/2021. (CLW) [Entered: 01/12/2021 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Fortunato N. Perri, Jr., Esq. for E. Marc Costanzo and Peter J. Scuderi, Esq. for E. Marc Costanzo requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/26/2021. Information Statement on or before 01/26/2021. Concise Summary on or before 01/26/2021. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 01/26/2021. (CLW) [Entered: 01/12/2021 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK ORDER consolidating the Appeals at Nos. 20-3610 and 20-3614 for Scheduling, Joint Appendix and Disposition. [20-3610, 20-3614] (AMR) [Entered: 12/29/2020 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AR) [Entered: 12/28/2020 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant E. Marc Costanzo in District Court No. 2-15-cv-06082. (AR) [Entered: 12/28/2020 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK (NEWSPAPERS), LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETER J. SCUDERI