This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 18:05:25 (UTC).

Frank Johnson v. Correct Care Solutions

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Frank Johnson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Correct Care Solutions. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6034

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

PARKER, Nurse

Defendant / Appellees

NURSE MELISSA

CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS

M. GASKINS, Administer Nurse

DIRECTOR RANDOLPH

RN SHANNON

MRS. NURSE MCLEAN

Plaintiff / Appellant

FRANK STEPHON JOHNSON

Columbia, SC 29209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ryan Joseph Patane Esq.

Attorney at SWEENY, WINGATE & BARROW, PA

P. O. Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211-0000

Mark Victor Gende

Attorney at SWEENY, WINGATE & BARROW, PA

P. O. Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Frank Stephon Johnson

Attorney at ALVIN S. GLENN DETENTION CENTER

201 John Mark Dial Drive

Columbia, SC 29209

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Correct Care Solutions, Mrs. M. Gaskins, McLean, Melissa, Randolph and Shannon. [19-6034] Ryan Patane [Entered: 02/05/2019 12:27 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER filed [1000443846] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [9]. Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Frank Johnson, #50451. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Frank Johnson and Accounting Office, ALVIN S. GLENN DETENTION CENTER, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:41 PM]

8 #1

Informal opening brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

8 #2

envelope

7 #1

Appearance of counsel

7 #6

Additional Document

7 #4

Additional Document

7 #5

Additional Document

7 #3

Additional Document

7 #2

Additional Document

6 #1

Additional Document

6 #2

Additional Document

6 #3

Additional Document

6 #4

Additional Document

6 #5

Additional Document

#6

Additional Document

5 #3

Lataire McLean

5 #2

Michele Gaskins

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • (#12) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 0:18-cv-00876-HMH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 02/06/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Correct Care Solutions, Mrs. M. Gaskins, McLean, Melissa, Randolph and Shannon. [19-6034] Ryan Patane [Entered: 02/05/2019 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER filed [1000443846] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [9]. Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Frank Johnson, #50451. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Frank Johnson and Accounting Office, ALVIN S. GLENN DETENTION CENTER, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • (#9) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Frank Stephon Johnson. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Frank Stephon Johnson. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Correct Care Solutions, Mrs. M. Gaskins, McLean, Melissa, Randolph and Shannon. [1000440318] [19-6034] Mark Gende [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ryan J. Patane for Correct Care Solutions, Mrs. M. Gaskins, Mrs. Nurse McLean, Nurse Melissa, Dr. Randolph and RN Shannon. [1000439336] [19-6034] Ryan Patane [Entered: 01/15/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Correct Care Solutions, Mrs. M. Gaskins, Mrs. Nurse McLean, Nurse Melissa, Dr. Randolph, and RN Shannon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000439312] [19-6034] Ryan Patane [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • (#4) SUPPLEMENTAL ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court record (paper) requested? N/A. (*Original record 01/04 and supplemental 1/09.) [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PLRA NOTICE issued to Frank Stephon Johnson. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Frank Johnson. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 0:18-cv-00876-HMH. Case manager: CBennett. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/04/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.