This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/19/2021 at 06:11:50 (UTC).

Frank, et al v. Wyoming Secretary of State, et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Frank filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Wyoming Secretary of State. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-8058

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Defendants

ED BUCHANAN, Wyoming Secretary of State

LEIGH ANN MANLOVE

Plaintiff / Appellees

JOHN C. FRANK

GRASSFIRE LLC

Defendant / Appellant

DEBRA LEE, Laramie County Clerk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

James B. Peters

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Wyoming

2424 Pioneer Avenue

Cheyenne, WY 82002

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin T. Barr

444 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60611

Benjamin Barr

Attorney at Barr & Klein

444 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60611

Stephen Ralph Klein

Attorney at Barr & Klein

1629 K Street Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jon Mark Stewart

Attorney at Davis & Cannon

422 West 26Th Street

Cheyenne, WY 82001

Catherine M. Young

Attorney at Davis & Cannon

422 West 26Th Street

Cheyenne, WY 82001

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Preliminary ROA

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10862332] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 10/01/2021. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 11/10/2021 for Debra Lee, Ed Buchanan and Leigh Ann Manlove. Please refer to this court's 09/08/2021 order for additional briefing information. [21-8058, 21-8059, 21-8060] [Entered: 10/01/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket[10859847] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/29/2021 for Margaret Botkins for appeal nos. 21-8058, 21-8059, and 21-8060. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-8058, 21-8059, 21-8060] [Entered: 09/22/2021 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket and notice record complete notice created for the district court. [AT] [10859841] Minute order filed - Record on appeal due district court 10/13/2021 for appeal nos. 21-8058, 21-8059, and 21-8060. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-8058, 21-8059, 21-8060] [Entered: 09/22/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10856198] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on our own motion to set a briefing schedule for these cross-appeals. Given the procedural history in the district court, this court will partially consolidate briefing, as provided in this order. Defendants-Appellants shall file a single consolidated brief and appendix within 40 days after the district court notifies the parties and this court that the record is complete. See order for details and additional information. Served on 09/08/2021. [21-8058, 21-8059, 21-8060] [Entered: 09/08/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket[10855438] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 09/17/2021 for Janet Davis (7/19/21 summary judgment hearing). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-8058] [Entered: 09/03/2021 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10855425] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Debra Lee in 21-8058, 21-8060. Transcript ordered: Summary Judgment Hearing held 07/19/21. Served on: 09/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-8058] CMY [Entered: 09/03/2021 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10855411] Docketing statement filed by Debra Lee in 21-8058. Served on 09/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-8058] CMY [Entered: 09/03/2021 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10855407] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jon Mark Stewart and Ms. Catherine M. Young for Debra Lee. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 09/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-8058, 21-8059, 21-8060] [Entered: 09/03/2021 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket[10855378] Entry of appearance submitted by J. Mark Stewart and Catherine M. Young for Appellant Debra Lee in 21-8058, Appellee Debra Lee in 21-8060, Not Party Debra Lee in 21-8059 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/03/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed][21-8058, 21-8060, 21-8059] CMY [Entered: 09/03/2021 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket as these parties are not participants in this appeal. [NA][10855204] Entry of appearance submitted by Mackenzie Williams; James B. Peters for Not Parties Ed Buchanan and Leigh Ann Manlove for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/02/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [21-8058] MW [Entered: 09/02/2021 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10853728] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Ralph Klein and John C. Frank and Benjamin T. Barr for John C. Frank and Grassfire LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(One of the parties listed is or was counsel of record). Served on 08/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-8058] [Entered: 08/27/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket[10853715] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen R. Klein; Benjamin Barr for Appellees John C. Frank and Grassfire LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-8058] --[Edited 08/27/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 8/27/2021.] SRK [Entered: 08/27/2021 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket[10852970] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 08/25/2021. [21-8058] [Entered: 08/25/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10852002] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/20/2021 Fee docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance are due by 09/03/2021 for Debra Lee. Notice of appearance due on 09/03/2021 for John C. Frank, Grassfire LLC. [21-8058] [Entered: 08/20/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less