This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:06:01 (UTC).

Francois Severe v. Antonio Torres, IV

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Francois Severe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Antonio Torres, IV. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12733

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

FRANCOIS SEVERE

Defendant / Appellant

ANTONIO VICENTE TORRES, IV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Curt Obront

Attorney at Obront Corey, PLLC

100 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 800

Miami, FL 33131-2305

Richard J. Diaz

Attorney at Law Offices of Richard J. Diaz, PA

3127 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6816

Domingo C. Rodriguez

Attorney at Rodriguez Law Office, LLC

95 Merrick Wy Ste 720

Miami, FL 33134

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Henry Joseph Hunnefeld

Attorney at Office of the Miami City Attorney

444 Sw 2Nd Ave Ste 945

Miami, FL 33130

Robert C. Buschel

Attorney at Buschel Gibbons, PA

100 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 1300

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

John Anthony Greco

Attorney at Office of the Miami City Attorney

444 Sw 2Nd Ave Ste 945

Miami, FL 33130

Christopher Allan Green

Attorney at Office of the Miami City Attorney

444 Sw 2Nd Ave Ste 945

Miami, FL 33130

Eric John Eves

Attorney at Office of the Miami City Attorney

444 Sw 2Nd Ave Ste 945

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

District Court Order, DE # 108

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Anthony Greco for Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:51 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John Anthony Greco for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:53 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney John Anthony Greco for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:54 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney John Anthony Greco for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:57 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Antonio V. Torres, IV, Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 03/21/2019. [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:47 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard J. Diaz for Francois Severe. [19-12733] (ECF: Richard Diaz) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:55 PM]

Open Document

Reply to response filed by Appellee Francois Severe. [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:19 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, Filer: Antonio V. Torres, IV, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 09/04/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 03/21/2019. [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:22 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellee Francois Severe [ # 8862331-2 ] filed by Attorney Eric John Eves for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. [19-12733] (ECF: Eric Eves) [Entered: 09/05/2019 07:39 PM]

Open Document

AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John Anthony Greco for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 09/05/2019 03:10 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric J. Eves for Antonio Torres IV [19-12733] (ECF: Eric Eves) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:53 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-12733 and 19-13023 filed by Francois Severe. Motion is Opposed. [8862331-1] [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:44 AM]

Open Document

AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Domingo C. Rodriguez for Appellee Francois Severe. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:18 AM]

Open Document

AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Domingo C. Rodriguez for Appellee Francois Severe. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:02 PM]

Open Document

Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Patricia Diaz, 07/26/2019, Antonio V. Torres, IV, Motion Hearing 03/21/2019. [Entered: 08/19/2019 08:49 AM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to response filed by Appellee Francois Severe. [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, Filer: Antonio V. Torres, IV, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 09/04/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 03/21/2019. [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellee Francois Severe [ # 8862331-2 ] filed by Attorney Eric John Eves for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. [19-12733] (ECF: Eric Eves) [Entered: 09/05/2019 07:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John Anthony Greco for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 09/05/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric J. Eves for Antonio Torres IV [19-12733] (ECF: Eric Eves) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-12733 and 19-13023 filed by Francois Severe. Motion is Opposed. [8862331-1] [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Domingo C. Rodriguez for Appellee Francois Severe. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Domingo C. Rodriguez for Appellee Francois Severe. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Patricia Diaz, 07/26/2019, Antonio V. Torres, IV, Motion Hearing 03/21/2019. [Entered: 08/19/2019 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Domingo C. Rodriguez for Appellee Francois Severe. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/14/2019 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Richard J. Diaz for Francois Severe and Domingo C. Rodriguez for Francois Severe. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/14/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability filed by Attorney John Anthony Greco for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Domingo C. Rodriguez for Francois Severe [19-12733] (ECF: Domingo Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard J. Diaz for Francois Severe. [19-12733] (ECF: Richard Diaz) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Antonio V. Torres, IV, Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 03/21/2019. [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney John Anthony Greco for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney John Anthony Greco for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John Anthony Greco for Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Anthony Greco for Antonio Vicente Torres, IV. [19-12733] (ECF: John Greco) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres, IV on 07/16/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/30/2019 as to Appellant Antonio Vicente Torres IV. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/13/2019 as to Appellee Francois Severe [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.