This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:07:37 (UTC).

Francisco Morales-Santiago v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Francisco Morales-Santiago filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70376

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRANCISCO MORALES-SANTIAGO, AKA Francisco Javier-Morales

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Devin T. Theriot-Orr

Attorney at Open Sky Law, PLLC

20415 72Nd Avenue S, Suite 110

Kent, WA 98032

Respondent Attorneys

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Sunah Lee

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Petition With Stay Motion and BIA Decision

1 #3

Counsel Case Information Packet

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Sunah Lee for party(s) Respondent William P. Barr, in case 20-70376. [11596569] (QDL) [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sunah Lee (Office of Immigration Litigation U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station Washington, DC 20044) for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 02/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11596524] [20-70376] (Lee, Sunah) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595708]. [20-70376] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? YES. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Response to motion for stay due 04/08/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Francisco Morales-Santiago. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11594777] (HC) [Entered: 02/12/2020 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.