This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/18/2021 at 06:26:14 (UTC).

Francisco Figueroa v. Delta Galil USA, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Francisco Figueroa filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Delta Galil USA, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15497

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant

DELTA GALIL USA, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

FRANCISCO FIGUEROA, on behalf of himself, all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellant

PENNSYLVANIA V.F. CORPORATION, a Pennsylvania corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Farrah Grant

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Law Office of Shaun Setareh

9665 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 S. Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Lonnie Domonic Giamela

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

444 South Flower Street, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/14/2021, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time). [12109057] (BLS) [Entered: 05/11/2021 11:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/14/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12089925] (BLS) [Entered: 04/28/2021 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/12/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12057165] (BLS) [Entered: 03/29/2021 04:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/26/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12054697]. [21-15497] (AD) [Entered: 03/26/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Francisco Figueroa Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/26/2021. [12054567] [21-15497] (Setareh, Chaim) [Entered: 03/26/2021 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/25/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12053905]. [21-15497] (AD) [Entered: 03/25/2021 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Pennsylvania V.F. Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/25/2021. [12053881] [21-15497] (Giamela, Lonnie) [Entered: 03/25/2021 05:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Pennsylvania V.F. Corporation Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/26/2021. Transcript ordered by 04/19/2021. Transcript due 05/17/2021. Appellant Pennsylvania V.F. Corporation opening brief due 06/28/2021. Appellee Francisco Figueroa answering brief due 07/26/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12047308] (JMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 10:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less