This case was last updated from PACER on 03/24/2020 at 06:03:44 (UTC).

Franciscan Alliance, Inc., et al v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary, et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Franciscan Alliance, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Alex Azar, II, Secretary. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-10093

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Plaintiff / Appellants

FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE, INCORPORATED

CHRISTIAN MEDICAL AND DENTAL SOCIETY

SPECIALTY PHYSICIANS OF ILLINOIS, L.L.C.

Intervenor / Appellees

AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF TEXAS

RIVER CITY GENDER ALLIANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bradley Philip Humphreys

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Alexander K. Haas

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Luke William Goodrich

Attorney at Becket Fund for Religious Liberty

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Intervenor / Appellee Attorneys

Andre Segura

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Texas

5225 Katy Freeway

Houston, TX 77007

Amy Miller

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

134 S. 13Th Street

Lincoln, NE 68508

Kali Cohn

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

6440 N. Central Expressway

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10093] (Brian Klosterboer ) [Entered: 03/18/2020 10:57 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. for filing Appellants' Opening Brief until 05/06/2020 [20-10093] (Joseph Charles Davis ) [Entered: 03/17/2020 06:24 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10093] (Scout Richters ) [Entered: 03/09/2020 11:57 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10093] (Lindsey Kaley ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:39 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10093] (Joshua A. Block ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:36 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 02/10/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cohn, Segura; Attorney for Appellant: Goodrich; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Haas, Humphreys, Miller. [20-10093] (Luke William Goodrich ) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:16 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Luke William Goodrich for Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10093] (Luke William Goodrich ) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:26 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10093] (Joseph Charles Davis ) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:20 PM]

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Denver Bryan Roden. [20-10093] (Denver Bryan Roden ) [Entered: 02/08/2020 10:34 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9240964-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 02/14/2020 for Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. [20-10093] (CB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:43 AM]

Open Document

US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. [20-10093] (LEF) [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:18 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Brian Klosterboer for party(s) Appellee River City Gender Alliance Appellee American Civil Liberties Union of Texas, in case 20-10093 [20-10093] (MVM) [Entered: 03/19/2020 07:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10093] (Brian Klosterboer ) [Entered: 03/18/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C.. Extension Granted to and including 05/06/2020. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/06/2020 for Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. [20-10093] (MVM) [Entered: 03/18/2020 07:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. for filing Appellants' Opening Brief until 05/06/2020 [20-10093] (Joseph Charles Davis ) [Entered: 03/17/2020 06:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Scout Richters for party(s) Appellee River City Gender Alliance Appellee American Civil Liberties Union of Texas, in case 20-10093 [20-10093] (MVM) [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10093] (Scout Richters ) [Entered: 03/09/2020 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joshua A. Block for party(s) Appellee River City Gender Alliance Appellee American Civil Liberties Union of Texas, in case 20-10093 [20-10093] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Lindsey Kaley for party(s) Appellee River City Gender Alliance Appellee American Civil Liberties Union of Texas, in case 20-10093 [20-10093] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/28/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10093] (Lindsey Kaley ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10093] (Joshua A. Block ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT [20-10093] (MVM) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 7:16-CV-108. Electronic ROA due on 02/26/2020. [20-10093] (MVM) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT. [20-10093] (MVM) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [20-10093] (MVM) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 02/10/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cohn, Segura; Attorney for Appellant: Goodrich; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Haas, Humphreys, Miller. [20-10093] (Luke William Goodrich ) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Luke William Goodrich for Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10093] (Luke William Goodrich ) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10093] (Joseph Charles Davis ) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Denver Bryan Roden. [20-10093] (Denver Bryan Roden ) [Entered: 02/08/2020 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9240964-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 02/14/2020 for Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. [20-10093] (CB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Christian Medical and Dental Society, Franciscan Alliance, Incorporated and Specialty Physicians of Illinois, L.L.C. [20-10093] (LEF) [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.