This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/30/2019 at 06:05:05 (UTC).

Franchini v. Pipes, et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 Franchini filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Pipes. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1539

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

THOMAS C. FRANCHINI, DPM

Defendant / Appellees

PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, PBC, d/b/a Philadelphia Inquirer, d/b/a Philly.com

SALLY PIPES

PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jens-Peter W. Bergen

Attorney at Law Office of Jens-Peter W. Bergen

79 Portland Rd

Kennebunk, ME 04043-6603

Raymond W. Belair

Attorney at Belair & Evans LLP

90 Broad St, 14Th Flr

New York, NY 10004

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Alfred Cecil Frawley IV

Attorney at McCloskey Mina & Cunniff LLC

12 City Center

Portland, ME 04101-0000

Eli Segal

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th & Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2799

Kenneth Michael Argentieri

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

600 Grant St, Ste 5010

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Andrea T. Holbrook

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

2 Monument Sq, Ste 505

Portland, ME 04101

Cynthia L. Counts

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree St Ne, Ste 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued directing appellant to file a brief and appendix or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 45.0(a). Brief and Appendix due 07/31/2019. [19-1539] (TS) [Entered: 07/17/2019 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Andrea T. Holbrook for Sally Pipes and Pacific Research Institute and Eli Segal for Philadelphia Media Network, PBC. [19-1539] (TS) [Entered: 07/09/2019 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 07/08/2019 , the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Andrea T. Holbrook for Sally Pipes and Pacific Research Institute and Eli Segal for Philadelphia Media Network, PBC. [19-1539] (TS) [Entered: 06/24/2019 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Thomas C. Franchini filed by Attorney Jens-Peter W. Bergen. Certificate of service dated 06/18/2019. [19-1539] (JWB) [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Philadelphia Media Network, PBC filed by Attorney Alfred C. Frawley IV. Certificate of service dated 06/08/2019. [19-1539] (ACF) [Entered: 06/08/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 07/16/2019 for appellant Thomas C. Franchini. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1539] (TS) [Entered: 06/06/2019 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Thomas C. Franchini. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2019. [19-1539] (RWB) [Entered: 06/06/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Thomas C. Franchini filed by Attorney Raymond W. Belair, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2019. [19-1539] (RWB) [Entered: 06/06/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Pacific Research Institute and Sally Pipes filed by Attorney Kenneth M. Argentieri. Certificate of service dated 06/05/2019. [19-1539] (KMA) [Entered: 06/05/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Pacific Research Institute and Sally Pipes filed by Attorney Cynthia L. Counts. Certificate of service dated 06/05/2019. [19-1539] (CLC) [Entered: 06/05/2019 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #26) filed by Appellant Thomas Franchini. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 06/14/2019. [19-1539] (TS) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK (NEWSPAPERS), LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CYNTHIA L COUNTS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREA T. HOLBROOK