This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/08/2020 at 06:01:48 (UTC).

France.com, Inc. v. The French Republic

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 France com, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The French Republic. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1016

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Defendants

JEAN-YVES LE DRIAN, in his official capacity as the French Republic's Minister for Europe and Foreign Affairs

VERISIGN, INCORPORATED

Defendant / Appellants

THE MINISTRY FOR EUROPE AND FOREIGN AFFAIRS

THE FRENCH REPUBLIC

FRANCE.COM, a domain name

ATOUT FRANCE

Plaintiff / Appellee

FRANCE.COM, INC., a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Zachary D. Cohen

Attorney at THOMPSON MCMULLAN PC

100 Shockoe Slip

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

John P. O'Herron Esq.

Attorney at THOMPSON MCMULLAN PC

100 Shockoe Slip

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

John Michael Griem Jr.

Attorney at CARTER, LEDYARD & MULBURN

2 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005-0000

Mark Richard Colombell Esq.

Attorney at THOMPSON MCMULLAN PC

100 Shockoe Slip

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

David Ludwig

Attorney at DUNLAP BENNETT & LUDWIG, PLLC

211 Church Street, Se

Leesburg, VA 20175

Benjamin S. Barlow

Attorney at DUNLAP BENNETT & LUDWIG, PLLC

211 Church Street, Se

Leesburg, VA 20175

 

Court Documents

#20

19 #2

Additional Document

19 #1

JOINT APPENDIX (electronic & paper form)

#18

#17

16 #2

Exhibit A to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss

16 #1

APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS

#15

#14

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 19 ] by Atout France, France.com, The French Republic and The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [2]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [609]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/18/2020. [1000686187] [20-1016] JSN [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 20 ] by Atout France, France.com, The French Republic and The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs. Number of pages: [66]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/18/2020. [1000686186] [20-1016] JSN [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEF by Atout France, France.com, The French Republic and The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/18/2020. [1000685021] [20-1016] John O'Herron [Entered: 02/18/2020 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Atout France, France.com, The French Republic and The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/18/2020. [1000685019] [20-1016] John O'Herron [Entered: 02/18/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Atout France, France.com, The French Republic and The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs to notice requesting response [ # 17 ], Motion [ # 16 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-1016] John O'Herron [Entered: 02/07/2020 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE ISSUED to Atout France, France.com, The French Republic and The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 16 ]. Response due 02/07/2020.[1000670990].. [20-1016] JSN [Entered: 01/28/2020 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION by France.com, Inc. to dismiss appeal [16]. Date and method of service: 01/27/2020 ecf. [1000670771] [20-1016] Benjamin Barlow [Entered: 01/27/2020 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by France.com, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000667502] [20-1016] David Ludwig [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David Ludwig for France.com, Inc.. [1000667500] [20-1016] David Ludwig [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ben Barlow for France.com, Inc.. [1000667461] [20-1016] Benjamin Barlow [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark Richard Colombell for Atout France, France.com, The French Republic and The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs. [1000666344] [20-1016] Mark Colombell [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000666329] [20-1016] John O'Herron [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The French Republic. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000666327] [20-1016] John O'Herron [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by France.com. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000666326] [20-1016] John O'Herron [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atout France. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000666323] [20-1016] John O'Herron [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Atout France, France.com, The French Republic and The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs. [20-1016] John O'Herron [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John P. O'Herron for Atout France, France.com, The French Republic and The Ministry for Europe and Foreign Affairs. [1000666319] [20-1016] John O'Herron [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/18/2020. Response Brief due 03/18/2020. [20-1016] JSN [Entered: 01/08/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00460-LO-IDD. [20-1016] JSN [Entered: 01/08/2020 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00460-LO-IDD. Case manager: JeffNeal. [20-1016] JSN [Entered: 01/08/2020 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VeriSign Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where THE FRANCES A VILLARI TRUST A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Stover Barlow

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Ludwig