This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/10/2022 at 06:17:17 (UTC).

Fox v. Kijakazi

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Fox filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Kijakazi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-793

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Lee Fox

Defendant / Appellee

Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Peter A. Gorton Esq.

Attorney at Lachman & Gorton

1500 East Main Street, P.O. Box 89

Endicott, NY 13761

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

100 South Clinton Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

Natasha Oeltjen Esq.

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

John F. Kennedy Federal Building, 15 New Sudbury Street

Boston, MA 02203

 

Court Documents

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

(#21) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Lee Fox Brief due date as 07/18/2022 FILED.[3305269] [22-793] [Entered: 04/28/2022 11:40 AM]

#18

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

10 #7

Supporting Document

10 #6

Supporting Document

10 #5

Supporting Document

10 #4

Supporting Document

10 #3

Supporting Document

10 #2

Supporting Document

10 #1

Form C FILED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

RESTRICTED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ATTORNEY, Karen Folster Lesperance for Kilolo Kijakazi, in case 22-793, [ # 22 ], ADDED.[3309218] [22-793] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kilolo Kijakazi, FILED. Service date 05/04/2022 by CM/ECF. [3308605] [22-793] [Entered: 05/04/2022 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Lee Fox Brief due date as 07/18/2022 FILED.[3305269] [22-793] [Entered: 04/28/2022 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[3303367] [22-793] [Entered: 04/26/2022 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kilolo Kijakazi, FILED. Service date 04/20/2022 by CM/ECF.[3300145] [22-793] [Entered: 04/20/2022 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Lee Fox, informing Court of proposed due date 07/18/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 04/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3299772] [22-793] [Entered: 04/19/2022 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Lee Fox, FILED. Service date 04/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3299765] [22-793] [Entered: 04/19/2022 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Lee Fox, FILED. Service date 04/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3299762] [22-793] [Entered: 04/19/2022 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Lee Fox, FILED. Service date 04/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3299756] [22-793] [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY, Natasha Oeltjen, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Heather LaCount, SUBSTITUTED.[3297611] [22-793] [Entered: 04/15/2022 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kilolo Kijakazi, FILED. Service date 04/15/2022 by CM/ECF. [3297439] [22-793] [Entered: 04/15/2022 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3297259] [22-793] [Entered: 04/14/2022 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/24/2022, RECEIVED.[3297252] [22-793] [Entered: 04/14/2022 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/24/2022, RECEIVED.[3297250] [22-793] [Entered: 04/14/2022 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lee Fox, FILED. [3297232] [22-793] [Entered: 04/14/2022 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natasha Oeltjen