This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/04/2021 at 05:22:39 (UTC).

Foundation for a Beautiful Life v. FCC

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Foundation for a Beautiful Life filed an Other lawsuit against FCC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1239

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

Foundation for a Beautiful Life

Appellee

Federal Communications Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Walter Elmer Diercks Esquire

Attorney at Rubin, Winston, Diercks, Harris & Cooke, LLP

1250 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

Appellee Attorneys

Adam Crews

Attorney at Federal Communications Commission

45 L Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20554-0004

Jacob M. Lewis

Attorney at Federal Communications Commission

45 L Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20554-0004

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1923837] of a decision by federal agency filed by Foundation for a Beautiful Life [Service Date: 11/22/2021] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1239] [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:53 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1923839] of Notice of Appeal sent to appellee [ # 1923837-2 ] [21-1239]--[Edited 11/23/2021 by SHA-Document Replaced by the Clerk's Office] [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:56 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1923840] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/07/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/23/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/23/2021. APPELLEE certified index to record due 01/07/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/07/2022 [21-1239]--[Edited 11/23/2021 by SHA-Document Replaced by Clerk's Office] [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:57 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1923862] filed by Adam G. Crews and co-counsel Jacob M. Lewis on behalf of Appellee FCC. [21-1239] (Crews, Adam) [Entered: 11/23/2021 05:24 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1923862] filed by Adam G. Crews and co-counsel Jacob M. Lewis on behalf of Appellee FCC. [21-1239] (Crews, Adam) [Entered: 11/23/2021 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1923840] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/23/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/07/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/23/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/23/2021. APPELLEE certified index to record due 01/07/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/07/2022 [21-1239]--[Edited 11/23/2021 by SHA-Document Replaced by Clerk's Office] [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1923839] of Notice of Appeal sent to appellee [ # 1923837-2 ] [21-1239]--[Edited 11/23/2021 by SHA-Document Replaced by the Clerk's Office] [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1923837] of a decision by federal agency filed by Foundation for a Beautiful Life [Service Date: 11/22/2021] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1239] [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAGENCY NOTICE OF APPEAL CASE docketed. [21-1239] [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foundation for a Smoke-Free World, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Matthew Lewis