This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/25/2020 at 06:06:20 (UTC).

Fluor Intercontinental, Inc. v. US

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Fluor Intercontinental, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1615

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

FLUOR INTERCONTINENTAL, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC.

UNITED STATES

VECTRUS SYSTEMS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Andrew E. Shipley

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Paul Reinherz Wolfson Esq.

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Philip Edward Beshara Esq.

Attorney at WilmerHale LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lee Paul Curtis

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

700 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Seth Locke

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

700 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Julia M. Fox

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

700 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Dan L. Bagatell

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

3 Weatherby Road

Hanover, NH 03755

Igor Helman

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Kevin P. Mullen

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Seth W. Lloyd

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Joseph Alex Ward

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Deanne Maynard

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 19 ] filed by Appellant Fluor Intercontinental, Inc. Each side shall bear its own costs. ISSUED AS A MANDATE: 04/24/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [689700] [JAL] [Entered: 04/24/2020 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION of Appellant Fluor Intercontinental, Inc. to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/23/2020 by email. [689628] [20-1615] [Andrew Shipley] [Entered: 04/23/2020 05:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Entry of appearance for J. Alex Ward as of counsel for Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 04/07/2020 by email. [684942] [20-1615] [Joseph Ward] [Entered: 04/07/2020 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Entry of appearance for Kevin P. Mullen as of counsel for Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 04/07/2020 by email. [684881] [20-1615] [Kevin Mullen] [Entered: 04/07/2020 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Entry of appearance for Seth W. Lloyd as of counsel for Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 04/07/2020 by email. [684875] [20-1615] [Seth Lloyd] [Entered: 04/07/2020 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 04/07/2020 by email. [684861] [20-1615] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 04/07/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Entry of appearance for Deanne E. Maynard as principal counsel for Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 04/07/2020 by email. [684860] [20-1615] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 04/07/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellant Fluor Intercontinental, Inc.. Service: 04/06/2020 by email. [684520] [20-1615] [Andrew Shipley] [Entered: 04/06/2020 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant, Fluor Intercontinental, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 04/13/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [684231] [LMN] [Entered: 04/06/2020 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Fluor Intercontinental, Inc.. Service: 04/03/2020 by email. [684179] [20-1615] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 12 ] [Andrew Shipley] [Entered: 04/03/2020 07:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Philip E. Beshara as of counsel for Appellant Fluor Intercontinental, Inc.. Service: 04/03/2020 by email. [684178] [20-1615] [Philip Beshara] [Entered: 04/03/2020 07:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Paul Wolfson as of counsel for Appellant Fluor Intercontinental, Inc.. Service: 04/03/2020 by email. [684177] [20-1615] [Paul Wolfson] [Entered: 04/03/2020 07:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Andrew Shipley as principal counsel for Appellant Fluor Intercontinental, Inc.. Service: 04/03/2020 by email. [684176] [20-1615] [Andrew Shipley] [Entered: 04/03/2020 07:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Lee P. Curtis as of counsel for Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 04/02/2020 by email. [683681] [20-1615] [Lee Curtis] [Entered: 04/02/2020 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Dan L. Bagatell as of counsel for Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683476] [20-1615] [Dan Bagatell] [Entered: 04/01/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Julia M. Fox as of counsel for Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683453] [20-1615] [Julia Fox] [Entered: 04/01/2020 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683441] [20-1615] [Seth Locke] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Seth H. Locke as principal counsel for Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 04/01/2020 by email. [683438] [20-1615] [Seth Locke] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Igor Helman as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 03/27/2020 by email. [682505] [20-1615] [Igor Helman] [Entered: 03/27/2020 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/20/2020. [682025] Entry of Appearance is due 04/09/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/09/2020. Docketing Statement is due 04/27/2020. Appellant's brief is due 05/26/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLUOR INTERCONTINENTAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Vectrus Systems Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant