This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/05/2022 at 09:59:17 (UTC).

Floyd v. City of New York

Case Summary

On 08/16/2013 Floyd filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    13-3088

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Petitioners

James Sample, Associate Professor, Hofstra Law School

Rudolph W. Giuliani

Richard J. Holwell, Esq.

Karl Manheim, Professor of Law, Loyola Law School

Laura K. Donohue, Professor of Law, Georgetown Law School

Jamal Greene, Professor of Law, Columbia University School ofLaw

Stanley Sporkin

Carlin Meyer, Professor of Law, Director, Diane Abbey Law Center for Children and Families, New York Law School

Rebecca Roiphe

Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York

Aziz Huq, Assistant Professor of Law, University of Chicago School of Law

Office of New York City of the Public Advocate

Robert J. Cindrich

Bennett L. Gershman

Defendants

New York City Police Officer Rodriguez, in his official capacity

New York Police Officer Moran, in his individual capacity

Raymond Kelly, Commissioner New York City Police, in his individual and official capacity

New York City Police Officers John and Jane Does

Intervenors and Petitioners

Detectives' Endowment Association, Inc.

Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York

Plaintiff / Appellee

Lalit Clarkson

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Matthew D, Brinckerhoff

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP

600 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10020

Andrew G. Celli Jr.

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP

600 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10020

Hayley Horowitz Esq.

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP

600 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10020

Daniel S. Connolly

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Rachel B. Goldman Esq.

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Brian E. Whiteley Esq.

Attorney at Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

1 International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Steven Andrew Engel Esq.

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Elisa Wiygul Esq.

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Cira Centre, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Darius Charney

Attorney at Center for Constitutional Rights

666 Broadway, Floor 7

New York, NY 10012

Baher Azmy Esq.

Attorney at Center for Constitutional Rights

666 Broadway, Floor 7

New York, NY 10012

Jonathan Clifford Moore

Attorney at Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP

99 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Joshua Moskovitz Esq.

Attorney at Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP

99 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Sunita Patel Esq.

Attorney at Center for Constitutional Rights

666 Broadway, Floor 7

New York, NY 10012

Other Attorneys

Heidi Grossman

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Anthony P. Coles Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Burt Neuborne

Attorney at New York University School of Law

Vanderbilt Hall, 40 Washington Square South

New York, NY 10012

Celeste L. Koeleveld

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Courtney Gilligan Saleski Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1 Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Deborah A. Brenner

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Kathy Chang Park Esq.

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#334

#304

#303

#531

(#531) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C and D, [530], [529], [528], on behalf of Appellee Lalit Clarkson, Deon Dennis, David Floyd and David Ourlicht, FILED.[3173413] [13-3088] [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:12 PM]

#527

#526

#521

520 #3

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_2

520 #2

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_1

520 #1

Per Curiam Opinion FILED

#517

#514

#512

#510

#505

504 #2

Notice_to_the_BAR

504 #1

Calendar_Notice (Hearing)

621 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#531) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C and D, [530], [529], [528], on behalf of Appellee Lalit Clarkson, Deon Dennis, David Floyd and David Ourlicht, FILED.[3173413] [13-3088] [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#530) FORM D, on behalf of Appellee Lalit Clarkson, Deon Dennis, David Floyd and David Ourlicht, FILED. Service date 08/27/2021 by CM/ECF.[3172854] [13-3088] [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#529) FORM C, on behalf of Appellee Lalit Clarkson, Deon Dennis, David Floyd and David Ourlicht, FILED. Service date 08/27/2021 by CM/ECF.[3172851] [13-3088] [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#528) FORM C, on behalf of Appellee Lalit Clarkson, Deon Dennis, David Floyd and David Ourlicht, FILED. Service date 08/27/2021 by CM/ECF.[3172847] [13-3088] [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#527) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1365576] [13-3088, 13-3461, 13-3524] [Entered: 11/07/2014 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#526) ORDER, that the petitions are denied. The related FRAP 29 motions and requests to file supplemental documents are denied as moot, FILED.[1365562] [13-3088] [Entered: 11/07/2014 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • Docket(#524) CAPTION, in light of Opinion filed, AMENDED.[1359476] [13-3088, 13-3461, 13-3524] [Entered: 10/31/2014 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#521) CERTIFIED OPINION, dated 10/31/2014, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1359325] [13-3088, 13-3461, 13-3524] [Entered: 10/31/2014 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#520) OPINION, Judge Torress July 30, 2014 decision is AFFIRMED as being an appropriate exercise of her discretion, the police unions motions to intervene in the appeals are DENIED, the Citys motion for voluntary dismissal of the appeals with prejudice is GRANTED, and the causes are REMANDED for such further proceedings before Judge Torres as may be appropriate in the circumstances. The mandate shall issue seven days from the date of the filing of this opinion, per curiam (JMW, JAC, BDP), FILED.[1359268] [13-3088, 13-3461, 13-3524] [Entered: 10/31/2014 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Docket(#519) CASE, before JMW, JAC, BDP, C.JJ., HEARD.[1345668] [13-3088, 13-3461, 13-3524] [Entered: 10/16/2014 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
340 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,acknowledgment and notice of appearance, [10], on behalf of Appellee Lalit Clarkson, Deon Dennis, David Floyd and David Ourlicht, FILED.[1022601] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/21/2013 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Deborah A. Brenner for City of New York, in case 13-3088 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[1022550] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/21/2013 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, Kathy H. Chang for City of New York, in case 13-3088 , [ # 8 ], ADDED.[1022548] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/21/2013 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lalit Clarkson, Deon Dennis, David Floyd and David Ourlicht, FILED. Service date 08/21/2013 by CM/ECF.[1022541] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/21/2013 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 08/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [1022409] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/21/2013 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, New York City Police Officer Goodman, New York City Police Officer Hernandez, New York City Police Officer Joyce, New York City Police Officer Pichardo, New York City Police Officer Rodriguez, New York City Police Officer Salmerson, New York City Police Officers John and Jane Does, New York City Police Sergeant Kelly, New York Police Officer Moran and Appellant City of New York, FILED. Service date 08/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [1022289] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/21/2013 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • Docket(#7) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, district court receipt # 465401074872, FILED.[1021152] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/20/2013 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1019155] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/16/2013 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/12/2013, RECEIVED.[1019154] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/16/2013 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. [1019143] [13-3088] [Entered: 08/16/2013 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Detectives' Endowment Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtney G. Saleski Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony P. Coles Esq.