This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2019 at 06:08:37 (UTC).

Florence Mussat v. IQVIA, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Florence Mussat filed an Other lawsuit against IQVIA, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1204

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

FLORENCE MUSSAT, M.D., S.C., on behalf of plaintiff and class members defined herein

Defendant / Appellees

JOHN DOES 1-10

IQVIA, INC.

Amicus Curiae

AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Heather Kolbus

Attorney at EDELMAN COMBS LATTURNER & GOODWIN, LLC

20 S. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Curtis Warner

Attorney at WARNER LAW FIRM, LLC

350 S. Northwest Highway

Park Ridge, IL 60068

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at EDELMAN COMBS LATTURNER & GOODWIN, LLC

20 S. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Cathleen M. Combs

Attorney at EDELMAN COMBS LATTURNER & GOODWIN, LLC

20 S. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Edward C. Eberspacher

Attorney at MEYER LAW GROUP LLC

30 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Joseph R. Palmore

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-1888

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Matthew Wessler

Attorney at GUPTA WESSLER PLLC

1900 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Heather Kolbus for Appellant Florence Mussat. [10] [6989161] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204] (Kolbus, Heather) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:45 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed Notice of District Court's Ruling by Appellant Florence Mussat. [6] [6986130] [19-1204] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:55 PM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Added Attorney(s) Joseph R. Palmore for party(s) Appellee IQVIA, Inc., in case 19-1204 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Appellee IQVIA, Inc.. [5] [6984821] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204]--[Edited 02/15/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Palmore, Joseph) [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:56 AM]

#9

(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Cathleen M. Combs for Appellant Florence Mussat. [9] [6989155] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204] (Combs, Cathleen) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:42 PM]

#1

Civil Case

#11

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Florence Mussat. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/12/2019 for IQVIA, Inc. and John Does 1-10. Paper copies due on 03/20/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [12] [6990566] [19-1204] (SK) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:57 PM]

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Curtis C. Warner for Appellant Florence Mussat. [8] [6989145] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [19-1204] (Warner, Curtis) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:33 PM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel A. Edelman for Appellant Florence Mussat. [7] [6989139] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:25 PM]

#15

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Edward C. Eberspacher IV for Appellee IQVIA, Inc.. [4] [6984773] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204] (Meyer, Daniel) [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:08 AM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#14

(#14) Brief deficiency letter sent to Amicus Curiae American Association for Justice. [14] [6992299] [19-1204] (SK) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:55 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Florence Mussat. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 18-8024 [3] [6983148] [19-1204] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:26 AM]

#16

(#16) Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae American Association for Justice by consent. Paper copies due on 03/28/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [16] [6992458] [19-1204] (SK) [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:00 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Re-Submitted brief by Matthew Wessler for Amicus Curiae American Association for Justice. Consent from all parties contained within brief. [15] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6992447] [19-1204] (Wessler, Matthew) [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae American Association for Justice by consent. Paper copies due on 03/28/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [16] [6992458] [19-1204] (SK) [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Brief deficiency letter sent to Amicus Curiae American Association for Justice. [14] [6992299] [19-1204] (SK) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Submitted brief by Matthew Wessler for amicus American Association for Justice. Consent from all parties contained within brief. [13] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6992256] [19-1204] (Wessler, Matthew) [Entered: 03/20/2019 05:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Florence Mussat. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/12/2019 for IQVIA, Inc. and John Does 1-10. Paper copies due on 03/20/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [12] [6990566] [19-1204] (SK) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Submitted appellant brief by Daniel A. Edelman for Appellant Florence Mussat. [11] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6990497] [19-1204] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Heather Kolbus for Appellant Florence Mussat. [10] [6989161] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204] (Kolbus, Heather) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Cathleen M. Combs for Appellant Florence Mussat. [9] [6989155] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204] (Combs, Cathleen) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Curtis C. Warner for Appellant Florence Mussat. [8] [6989145] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [19-1204] (Warner, Curtis) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel A. Edelman for Appellant Florence Mussat. [7] [6989139] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed Notice of District Court's Ruling by Appellant Florence Mussat. [6] [6986130] [19-1204] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Added Attorney(s) Joseph R. Palmore for party(s) Appellee IQVIA, Inc., in case 19-1204 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Appellee IQVIA, Inc.. [5] [6984821] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204]--[Edited 02/15/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Palmore, Joseph) [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Edward C. Eberspacher IV for Appellee IQVIA, Inc.. [4] [6984773] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1204] (Meyer, Daniel) [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Florence Mussat. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 18-8024 [3] [6983148] [19-1204] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Case transferred from Miscellaneous Docket No. 18-8024. [6982057-2] [6982057] [19-1204, 18-8024] (JR) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • (#2) No attorney(s) added for Appellee John Does 1-10, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [6982009] [19-1204] (FP) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 02/15/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Florence Mussat by 02/08/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/13/2019 for Florence Mussat [1] [6981984] [19-1204] (FP) [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.