This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/23/2022 at 05:18:06 (UTC).

Flash-Control, LLC v. Micron Technology Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 Flash-Control, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Micron Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1914

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

FLASH-CONTROL, LLC

Appellee

MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Appellee Attorney

Jeremy Jason Lang

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/14/2022. [856419] Entry of Appearance is due on 07/05/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/05/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 07/05/2022. Certified List is due on 08/01/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 06/21/2022 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Jason Lang