This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/05/2021 at 06:13:19 (UTC).

First State Insurance Company v. Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 First State Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-30

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

First State Insurance Company

New England Reinsurance Corporation

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

Doe Insurers, 1 through 10

Columbia Casualty Company

Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania

Continental Insurance Company, Successor Harbor Insurance Company

Century Indemnity Company, FKA CCI Insurance Co, FKA Insurance Company of North America

Federal Insurance Company

Granite State Insurance Company

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Swiss Reinsurance America Company, Successor, Forum Insurance Co.

Columbia Casualty Company

Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania

Continental Insurance Company, Successor Harbor Insurance Company

Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Successor, Familian Corporation

American Home Assurance Company

Federal Insurance Company

ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Granite State Insurance Company

Central National Insurance Company of Omaha

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff

New England Reinsurance Corporation

Counter Claimant and Defendant / Appellant

Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Successor, Familian Corporation

Counter Claimants and Defendant / Appellees

American Home Assurance Company

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Oakwood Insurance Company, as successor by merger to Central National Insurance Company of Omaha, but only as to policies issued by Cravens, Dargan & Company, Pacific Coast, and its subsidiaries

Swiss Reinsurance America Company, Successor, Forum Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Mark K. Ostrowski

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin LLP

1 Constitution Plaza

Hartford, CT 06103

Patrick M. Fahey Esq.

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin LLP

1 Constitution Plaza

Hartford, CT 06103

Counter Claimant and Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Jeffrey Louis Schulman Esq.

Attorney at Pasich LLP

757 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kevin John O'Connor Esq.

Attorney at Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing, P.C.

265 Franklin Street

Boston, MA 02110

Michael Anthony Kotula Esq.

Attorney at Rivkin Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

Laura Alexandra Zaino Esq.

Attorney at Halloran & Sage, LLP

1 Goodwin Square, 225 Asylum Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Arthur J. McColgan Esq. II

Attorney at Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP

1 North Franklin Street

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#65

#63

#59

#55

#54

#51

#50

#48

#46

#45

#43

#41

#39

#38

#37

#34

#31

#29

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Follow-up Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/04/2021, Start Time: 3:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3041262] [21-30] [Entered: 02/22/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MOTION ORDER, granting motions for admission pro hac vice [ # 55 ][ # 54 ] filed by -- New England Reinsurance Corporation and First State Insurance Company, by SJM, FILED. [3034937][63] [21-30] [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/09/2021 by CM/ECF.[3033288] [21-30] [Entered: 02/09/2021 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTIONS[ # 54 ], on behalf of -- First State Insurance Company and New England Reinsurance Corporation, FILED.[3032099] [21-30] [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#56) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, motions[53], [52], on behalf of -- First State Insurance Company and New England Reinsurance Corporation, FILED.[3032094] [21-30] [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of -- First State Insurance Company and New England Reinsurance Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3032086] [21-30] [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of -- First State Insurance Company and New England Reinsurance Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3032081] [21-30] [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#53) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of -- First State Insurance Company and New England Reinsurance Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3032032] [21-30] [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#52) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of -- First State Insurance Company and New England Reinsurance Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3032029] [21-30] [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of -- First State Insurance Company and New England Reinsurance Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3032022] [21-30] [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3016520] [21-30] [Entered: 01/19/2021 08:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3016519] [21-30] [Entered: 01/19/2021 08:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3016516] [21-30] [Entered: 01/19/2021 07:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3009572] [21-30] [Entered: 01/08/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docket(#7) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., district court receipt # ACTDC-6307049, FILED.[3009582] [21-30] [Entered: 01/08/2021 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 12/09/2020, RECEIVED.[3009568] [21-30] [Entered: 01/08/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT RULING ORDER, dated 05/29/2020, RECEIVED.[3009566] [21-30] [Entered: 01/08/2021 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 06/18/2019, RECEIVED.[3009562] [21-30] [Entered: 01/08/2021 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT RULING AND ORDER, dated 09/28/2018, RECEIVED.[3009516] [21-30] [Entered: 01/08/2021 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., FILED. [3009502] [21-30] [Entered: 01/08/2021 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New England Reinsurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Swiss Re Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Central National Insurance Company of Omaha is a litigant

Latest cases where First State Insurance Company is a litigant