This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/27/2019 at 06:04:56 (UTC).

Firearms Policy Coalition, In, et al v. ATF, et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Firearms Policy Coalition, In filed an Other lawsuit against ATF. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5043

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Thomas E. Brandon, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives

William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States

United States of America

Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives

Plaintiff / Appellees

Damien Guedes

Firearms Policy Foundation

Madison Society Foundation, Inc.

Shane Roden

Florida Carry, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., CA 18-3083

Amicus Curiae

Erwin Chemerinsky

Victoria Nourse

Jed Shugerman

Morton Rosenberg

W. Clark Aposhian

Lawrence Reynolds

Richard Painter

Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence

Trip Rothschild

Alan B. Morrison

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott R. McIntosh

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Abby Christine Wright

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Hashim M. Mooppan Esquire

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Matthew J. Glover

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Bradley Hinshelwood

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Joshua Prince Esquire

Attorney at Prince Law Office, P.C.

646 Lenape Road

Bechtelsville, PA 19505

Adam Kraut

Attorney at Prince Law Office, P.C.

646 Lenape Road

Bechtelsville, PA 19505

Erik Scott Jaffe

Attorney at Schaerr Jaffe LLP

1717 K Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Woofter

Attorney at Goldstein & Russell, PC

7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850

Bethesda, MD 20814

Thomas Che Goldstein

Attorney at Goldstein & Russell, PC

7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850

Bethesda, MD 20814

Charles H. Davis

Attorney at Goldstein & Russell, PC

7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850

Bethesda, MD 20814

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Stephen Adam Weisbrod

Attorney at Weisbrod Matteis & Copley PLLC

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Joseph Carl Cecere Jr.

Attorney at Cecere PC

6035 Mccommas Boulevard

Dallas, TX 75206

Steven M. Simpson

Attorney at New Civil Liberties Alliance

1225 19Th Street, Nw, Suite 450

Washington, DC 20036

Conor Shaw

Attorney at Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

1101 K Street, Nw, Suite 201

Washington, DC 20005

Nikhel Suresh Sus Esquire

Attorney at Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

1101 K Street, Nw, Suite 201

Washington, DC 20005

Ian Simmons

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-4001

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Order from Tenth Circuit

Open Document #1

28(j) Letter

Open Document #2

Aposhian Opinion

Open Document #1

Letter Filed

Open Document

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Docketing Statement Filed

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [19-5043] [Entered: 03/23/2019 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1779025] filed that the motion of the Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., to dismiss its appeal, No. 19-5043, be granted. Appeal No. 19-5043 is hereby dismissed. It is FURTHER ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that the effective date of the Bump-Stock Rule, 83 Fed. Reg. 66514 (Dec. 26, 2018), be administratively stayed in its application only as to the named Appellants in appeals Nos. 19-5042 and 19-5044, pending further order of this Court. The purpose of this stay is exclusively to give the Court sufficient opportunity to consider the disposition of this highly expedited appeal, and should not be construed in any way as a ruling on the merits of the appeal. See D.C. Circuit Handbook of Practice and Internal Procedures 33 (2018). The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith in No. 19-5043 only. Before Judges: Henderson, Srinivasan and Millett. [19-5042, 19-5043, 19-5044] [Entered: 03/23/2019 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1779005] to dismiss case voluntarily (Response to Motion served by hand due on 04/01/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/01/2019), to stay underlying order in case filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. in 19-5043 (Service Date: 03/22/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 704 words. [19-5043, 19-5042, 19-5044] (Goldstein, Thomas) [Entered: 03/22/2019 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Henderson, Srinivasan and Millett. [19-5042, 19-5043, 19-5044] [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1778789] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by David Codrea, Scott Heuman and Owen Monroe in 19-5044 [Service Date: 03/21/2019 ] [19-5044, 19-5042, 19-5043] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1778253] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by ATF, William P. Barr, Thomas E. Brandon and USA in 19-5042, 19-5043, ATF and William P. Barr in 19-5044 [Service Date: 03/19/2019 ] [19-5042, 19-5043, 19-5044] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1778205] filed by Alan Alexander Beck on behalf of Appellants David Codrea, Scott Heuman and Owen Monroe in 19-5044. [19-5044, 19-5042, 19-5043] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 03/18/2019 07:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1777941] filed by Firearms Policy Foundation, Florida Carry, Inc., Damien Guedes, Madison Society Foundation, Inc. and Shane Roden in 19-5042 [Service Date: 03/15/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,197 words. [19-5042, 19-5043, 19-5044] (Kraut, Adam) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1777825] filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. in 19-5043 [Service Date: 03/15/2019 ] Length of Brief: 4,966 words. [19-5043, 19-5042, 19-5044] (Goldstein, Thomas) [Entered: 03/15/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1777713] filed by David Codrea, Scott Heuman and Owen Monroe in 19-5044 [Service Date: 03/14/2019 ] Length of Brief: 1,579 Words. [19-5044, 19-5042, 19-5043] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1775047] to motion to expedite case [ # 1774980-2 ], motion to expedite oral argument [ # 1774980-3 ], motion to establish briefing schedule [ # 1774980-4 ] filed by USA, Thomas E. Brandon, William P. Barr and ATF in 19-5042, 19-5043, William P. Barr and ATF in 19-5044 [Service Date: 02/26/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,1019 words. [19-5042, 19-5043, 19-5044] (Wright, Abby) [Entered: 02/26/2019 08:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1775037] filed by David Codrea, Scott Heuman and Owen Monroe in 19-5044 [Service Date: 02/26/2019 ] [19-5044, 19-5042, 19-5043] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 02/26/2019 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775027] filed by Hashim M. Mooppan and co-counsel Abby C. Wright, Scott R. McIntosh on behalf of Appellees ATF, William P. Barr, Thomas E. Brandon and USA in 19-5042, 19-5043, Appellees ATF and William P. Barr in 19-5044. [19-5042, 19-5043, 19-5044] (Wright, Abby) [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1775014] filed by Stephen D. Stamboulieh on behalf of Appellants Scott Heuman, Owen Monroe and David Codrea in 19-5044. [19-5044, 19-5042, 19-5043] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1774992] filed by Joshua Prince and co-counsel Adam Kraut on behalf of Appellants Firearms Policy Foundation, Florida Carry, Inc., Damien Guedes, Madison Society Foundation, Inc. and Shane Roden in 19-5042, Appellees Firearms Policy Foundation, Florida Carry, Inc., Damien Guedes, Madison Society Foundation, Inc. and Shane Roden in 19-5043. [19-5042, 19-5043] (Prince, Joshua) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1774980] to expedite case, to expedite oral argument, to establish briefing schedule filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. and Firearms Policy Foundation, Florida Carry, Inc., Damien Guedes, Madison Society Foundation, Inc. and Shane Roden in 19-5042, 19-5043 (Service Date: 02/26/2019 by 3rd Party, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,416 words. [19-5042, 19-5043] (Goldstein, Thomas) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1774973] filed by Thomas C. Goldstein and co-counsel Daniel Woofter on behalf of Appellee Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. in 19-5042, Appellant Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. in 19-5043. [19-5042, 19-5043] (Goldstein, Thomas) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1774914] filed consolidating cases 19-5043, 19-5044 (Consolidation started 02/26/2019) with 19-5042; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/28/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 03/28/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/28/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/28/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/28/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 03/28/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/28/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/28/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/12/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 03/28/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 03/28/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/28/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/12/2019 [19-5042, 19-5043, 19-5044] [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1774873] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02988-DLF filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5043. [19-5043] [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5043] [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA CARRY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MADISON SOCIETY FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence is a litigant

Latest cases where Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives is a litigant