This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/13/2021 at 06:30:56 (UTC).

Finjan LLC v. SonicWALL, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Finjan LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SonicWALL, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1048

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

FINJAN LLC, fka Finjan, Inc.

Defendant / Appellee

SONICWALL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Juanita Rose Brooks

Attorney at Fish & Richardson

12860 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Michael John Ballanco Esq.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1000 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Robert Courtney

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

60 South Sixth Street, 3200 Rbc Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jason W. Wolff

Attorney at Fish & Richardson

12860 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Colby Brian Springer

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew Christopher Gaudet

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jennifer H. Forte

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jarrad Gunther

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4196

Robin L. McGrath

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Robert M. Palumbos

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30 South 17Th Street, One Liberty Place

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Joseph Powers

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30 South 17Th Street, One Liberty Place

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Juanita R. Brooks; Michael J. Ballanco; Jason W. Wolff; Robert Courtney as counsel for Appellant Finjan LLC. Service: 10/25/2021 by email. [808089] [22-1048] [Juanita Brooks] [Entered: 10/25/2021 06:30 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Finjan LLC. Service: 10/25/2021 by email. [808090] [22-1048] [Juanita Brooks] [Entered: 10/25/2021 06:31 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Finjan LLC. Service: 10/25/2021 by email. [808091] [22-1048] [Juanita Brooks] [Entered: 10/25/2021 06:33 PM]

#5

(#5) MOTION of Appellant Finjan LLC to extend the time to 02/11/2022 to file brief. Service: 10/25/2021 by email. [808092] [22-1048] [Juanita Brooks] [Entered: 10/25/2021 06:35 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Matthew C. Gaudet (Principal Counsel); Robin McGrath; Robert M. Palumbos; Joseph A. Powers; Jarrad M. Gunther; Jennifer H. Forte as counsel for Appellee SonicWALL, Inc.. Service: 10/28/2021 by email. [808915] [22-1048] [Matthew Gaudet] [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:39 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee SonicWALL, Inc.. Service: 10/28/2021 by email. [808918] [22-1048] [Matthew Gaudet] [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:41 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee SonicWALL, Inc.. Service: 10/28/2021 by email. [808919] [22-1048] [Matthew Gaudet] [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:43 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee SonicWALL, Inc.. Service: 10/28/2021 by email. [808919] [22-1048] [Matthew Gaudet] [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee SonicWALL, Inc.. Service: 10/28/2021 by email. [808918] [22-1048] [Matthew Gaudet] [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Matthew C. Gaudet (Principal Counsel); Robin McGrath; Robert M. Palumbos; Joseph A. Powers; Jarrad M. Gunther; Jennifer H. Forte as counsel for Appellee SonicWALL, Inc.. Service: 10/28/2021 by email. [808915] [22-1048] [Matthew Gaudet] [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 5 ] filed by Appellant Finjan LLC. The opening brief is due 02/11/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [808118] [JCW] [Entered: 10/26/2021 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION of Appellant Finjan LLC to extend the time to 02/11/2022 to file brief. Service: 10/25/2021 by email. [808092] [22-1048] [Juanita Brooks] [Entered: 10/25/2021 06:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Finjan LLC. Service: 10/25/2021 by email. [808091] [22-1048] [Juanita Brooks] [Entered: 10/25/2021 06:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Finjan LLC. Service: 10/25/2021 by email. [808090] [22-1048] [Juanita Brooks] [Entered: 10/25/2021 06:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Juanita R. Brooks; Michael J. Ballanco; Jason W. Wolff; Robert Courtney as counsel for Appellant Finjan LLC. Service: 10/25/2021 by email. [808089] [22-1048] [Juanita Brooks] [Entered: 10/25/2021 06:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/13/2021. [805587] Entry of Appearance is due on 10/28/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/28/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 10/28/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 12/13/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 10/14/2021 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonicwall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Finjan, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer H. Forte

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robin L. McGrath