This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2019 at 06:04:46 (UTC).

Fidelis Agbapurunowu v. NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 Fidelis Agbapurunowu filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against NBC Subsidiary WRC-TV , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1236

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

FIDELIS AGBAPURUNOWU

Defendant / Appellees

NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, d/b/a NBC4 Washington

NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Katherine Lynn Herrmann

Attorney at ERLICH LAW OFFICE

2111 Wilson Boulevard

Arlington, VA 22201

Joshua Harry Erlich

Attorney at ERLICH LAW OFFICE

2111 Wilson Boulevard

Arlington, VA 22201

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jay Ward Brown

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR, LLP

1909 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1157

 

Court Documents

18 #2

APPENDIX Volume 2

18 #1

APPENDIX (electronic & paper form)

#17

(#17) BRIEF by Fidelis Agbapurunowu in 19-1236 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/29/2019. [1000502498] [19-1236, 19-1272] Katherine Herrmann [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:52 PM]

Open Document

Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1236, 19-1272] MRB [Entered: 04/10/2019 08:03 AM]

#14

(#14) Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1236, 19-1272] MRB [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:17 PM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Fidelis Agbapurunowu. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/29/2019. Opening/Response Brief Due: 05/28/2019. Response/Reply Brief Due 06/27/2019. [19-1236, 19-1272] RE [Entered: 03/19/2019 07:10 AM]

11 #2

Addendum to Docketing Statement

11 #1

Docketing statement (civil/agency)

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joshua Erlich for Fidelis Agbapurunowu in 19-1272, 19-1236. [1000477357] [19-1272, 19-1236] Joshua Erlich [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:09 PM]

#9

(#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. [19-1272] Jay Brown [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:56 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000477290] [19-1272] Jay Brown [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:55 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jay Ward Brown for NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. [1000477289] [19-1272] Jay Brown [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:53 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Katherine L. Herrmann for Fidelis Agbapurunowu. [1000474152] [19-1236] Katherine Herrmann [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:52 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01555-AJT-MSN. [19-1236] RE [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:22 AM]

#3

(#6) ORDER filed [1000475118] consolidating case 19-1272 with 19-1236. Cross-appeal appellant: Fidelis Agbapurunownu. Copies to all parties. [19-1236, 19-1272] RE [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:19 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 18 ] by Fidelis Agbapurunowu in 19-1236. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [2]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [98]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/29/2019. [1000504949] [19-1236, 19-1272] RE [Entered: 05/02/2019 07:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 17 ] by Fidelis Agbapurunowu in 19-1236. Number of pages: [41]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/29/2019. [1000504942] [19-1236, 19-1272] RE [Entered: 05/02/2019 07:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Fidelis Agbapurunowu in 19-1236. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/29/2019. [1000502503] [19-1236, 19-1272] Katherine Herrmann [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) BRIEF by Fidelis Agbapurunowu in 19-1236 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/29/2019. [1000502498] [19-1236, 19-1272] Katherine Herrmann [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1236, 19-1272] MRB [Entered: 04/10/2019 08:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Fidelis Agbapurunowu in 19-1236. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000482041] [19-1236, 19-1272] Katherine Herrmann [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Fidelis Agbapurunowu in 19-1236, 19-1272 re: filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Fidelis Agbapurunowu on 03/29/2019. [19-1236, 19-1272] RE [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1236, 19-1272] MRB [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1236, 19-1272]--[Edited 03/19/2019 by MFT - See ECF 14] MRB [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Fidelis Agbapurunowu. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/29/2019. Opening/Response Brief Due: 05/28/2019. Response/Reply Brief Due 06/27/2019. [19-1236, 19-1272] RE [Entered: 03/19/2019 07:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joshua Erlich for Fidelis Agbapurunowu in 19-1272, 19-1236. [1000477357] [19-1272, 19-1236] Joshua Erlich [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. [19-1272] Jay Brown [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000477290] [19-1272] Jay Brown [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jay Ward Brown for NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. [1000477289] [19-1272] Jay Brown [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER filed [1000475118] consolidating case 19-1272 with 19-1236. Cross-appeal appellant: Fidelis Agbapurunownu. Copies to all parties. [19-1236, 19-1272] RE [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Katherine L. Herrmann for Fidelis Agbapurunowu. [1000474152] [19-1236] Katherine Herrmann [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000471831] [19-1236] Jay Brown [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jay Ward Brown for NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. [1000470272] [19-1236] Jay Brown [Entered: 03/05/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01555-AJT-MSN. [19-1236] RE [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01555-AJT-MSN. Case manager: REdwards. [19-1236] RE [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less