This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/19/2019 at 06:09:45 (UTC).

Fernando Vargas v. David Beth, et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Fernando Vargas filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against David Beth,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1965

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FERNANDO VARGAS

Respondents

RICARDO WONG

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States

DAVID G. BETH

KEVIN K. MCALEENAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jacob S. Briskman

Attorney at JACOB S. BRISKMAN ATTORNEY AT LAW PC

2054 N. California Avenue

Chicago, IL 60647-0210

Respondent Attorneys

Lisa T. Warwick

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

517 E. Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Kenneth John Ian

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

J. Max Weintraub

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

Jonathan H. Koenig

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

517 E. Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

10 #1

Final Order with Mandate

10 #2

Mandate

Open Restricted Document #1

Certified copy sent

Open Restricted Document #2

Mandate

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7018027-2] [7018027] [19-1965] (VG) [Entered: 07/18/2019 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re: Joint motion for voluntary dismissal. This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 9 ][10][7018014] [19-1965] (VG) [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint motion filed by Appellants William P. Barr, David G. Beth, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ricardo Wong and Appellee Fernando Vargas to dismiss case. [9] [7017671] [19-1965] (Koenig, Jonathan) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appearance form filed by Attorney Kenneth J. Ian for Appellants William P. Barr, David G. Beth, Kevin K. McAleenan and Ricardo Wong. [8] [7012546] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1965] [8] [7012546] [19-1965]--[Edited 06/20/2019 by CMD to reflect addition of counsel.] (Ian, Kenneth) [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending the Solicitor General's decision whether to go forward with the appeal. Counsel for appellants are DIRECTED to advise the Circuit Mediation Office electronically when the decision has been made. JNS [7012249] [19-1965] (VG) [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants William P. Barr, David G. Beth, Kevin K. McAleenan and Ricardo Wong. [6] [7012195] [19-1965] (Koenig, Jonathan) [Entered: 06/19/2019 09:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) J. Max Weintraub for party(s) Appellant William P. Barr Appellant Kevin K. McAleenan Appellant David G. Beth Appellant Ricardo Wong, in case 19-1965 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure statement and Appearance form filed by Attorney J. Max Weintraub for Appellants William P. Barr, David G. Beth, Kevin K. McAleenan and Ricardo Wong. [5] [7012148] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1965]--[Edited 06/19/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel and proper document filed.] (Weintraub, J. Max) [Entered: 06/19/2019 07:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Appearance form filed by Attorney Jonathan H. Koenig for Appellants William P. Barr, David G. Beth, Kevin K. McAleenan and Ricardo Wong. [4] [7011900] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1965]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by PS - to reflect addition of counsel] (Koenig, Jonathan) [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 07/19/2019 for William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, David G. Beth, Kevin K. McAleenan and Ricardo Wong. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/19/2019 for Fernando Vargas. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/09/2019 for Appellants William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, David G. Beth, Kevin K. McAleenan and Ricardo Wong. JNS [7007865] [19-1965] (PS) [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, June 19, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS [2] [7007862] [19-1965] (PS) [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docket(#1) Federal prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. U.S. Appeal. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 06/03/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/01/2019 for William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, David G. Beth, Kevin K. McAleenan and Ricardo Wong. [1] [7006112] [19-1965]-[Edited 05/21/2019 by FP to reflect correct deadlines due.] (FP) [Entered: 05/21/2019 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob S. Briskman