This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:08:11 (UTC).

Fernando Fernandez Segura v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Fernando Fernandez Segura filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70379

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FERNANDO FERNANDEZ SEGURA

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Maricela Amezola Esquire

Attorney at Amezola Legal Group, Apc

4411 30Th Street, Suite 203

San Diego, CA 92116

Respondent Attorneys

Sherease Rosalyn Pratt

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Counseled Immigration Packet

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #4

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Petition for Review and Motion for Stay of Removal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Sherease Rosalyn Pratt for party(s) Respondent William P. Barr, in case 20-70379. [11597156] (QDL) [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sherease Rosalyn Pratt (United States Department of Justice, Civil Division, Office of Immigration Litigation, P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station, Washington, DC 20044) for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 02/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11597143] [20-70379] (Pratt, Sherease) [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Petitioner Fernando Fernandez Segura Correspondence: We filed the Petition for Review in a rush, and we inadvertently failed to include information that Mr. Fernandez Segura is currently detained at the Otay Mesa Detention Facility in San Diego, California. We are asking the Court to make that change.. Date of service: 02/13/2020 [11596033] [20-70379] (Amezola, Maricela) [Entered: 02/13/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595711]. [20-70379] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? YES. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Response to motion for stay due 04/08/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Fernando Fernandez Segura. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11595216] (BY) [Entered: 02/12/2020 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.